EP3143421 - Protective and immobilizing sleeves with sensors, and methods for reducing the effect of object movement during MRI scanning [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aspect Imaging Ltd. Hashaked 27 A.T. Modi'in P.O. Box 926 60850 Shoham / IL | [2017/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAPOPORT, Uri 17 Moshav Ben Shemen 73115 Moshav Ben Shemen / IL | [2017/12] | Representative(s) | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP The Gridiron Building One Pancras Square London N1C 4AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/12] | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP 16 Upper Woburn Place London WC1H 0BS / GB | Application number, filing date | 15792237.8 | 13.05.2015 | [2017/12] | WO2015IL50504 | Priority number, date | US201461992312P | 13.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461992312 P | US201462015539P | 23.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462015539 P | [2017/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015173817 | Date: | 19.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3143421 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/422 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
G01R33/28 (EP,US);
G01R33/288 (US);
A61B5/055 (US);
G01R33/3403 (US);
G01R33/422 (EP,US);
G01R33/56509 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/12] | Title | German: | SCHUTZ- UND IMMOBILISIERUNGSMANSCHETTEN MIT SENSOREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG DES EFFEKTS VON OBJEKTBEWEGUNG BEI MRT-SCANS | [2017/12] | English: | Protective and immobilizing sleeves with sensors, and methods for reducing the effect of object movement during MRI scanning | [2017/12] | French: | GAINES DE PROTECTION ET D'IMMOBILISATION DOTÉES DE CAPTEURS, ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE RÉDUIRE L'EFFET DU MOUVEMENT DE L'OBJET PENDANT LE BALAYAGE D'IRM | [2017/12] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/12] | 23.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/14] | 13.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0825450 (ESAOTE SPA [IT]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 6 * * figure 1 * * figures 7,8 * [I] 2-8; | [XI]US7772503 (GINANNESCHI ALDO [IT]) [X] 1 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0056] * [I] 2-8; | [A]WO2013190451 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-8* figure 1 * | International search | [A]US5159929 (MORRIS G RONALD [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * entire document *; | [A]US5400787 (MARANDOS THOMAS A [US]) [A] 1-19* entire document *; | [Y]US6683456 (KINANEN ILMARI [FI]) [Y] 5 * entire document *; | [Y]US2005148845 (DEAN DAVID E [US], et al) [Y] 3, 4, 6, 10, 17 * entire document *; | [A]US7039266 (DOTY MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-19 * entire document *; | [A]US2007010896 (GRAY ROBERT W [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * entire document *; | [Y]US2008060843 (GINANNESCHI ALDO [IT]) [Y] 1-19 * entire document *; | [A]US2011270362 (GOEDEKE STEVEN D [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * entire document *; | [Y]WO2013190451 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [Y] 1-19 * entire document * |