Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.01.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
20.09.2019 | First examination report | |
14.09.2019 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
27.05.2019 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.05.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant | |
14.07.2017 | Change: Validation states | published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] |
14.07.2017 | Change - extension states | published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] |
26.05.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.05.2017 | Supplementary search report | published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] |
28.04.2017 | Change - classification | published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] |
28.04.2017 | Change - classification | published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] |
17.02.2017 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
17.02.2017 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
17.02.2017 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
23.01.2017 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.11.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
31.10.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.10.2016 | Change - representative | |
21.10.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.11.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.11.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication |