Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10313666 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2019 | B2 | US2017054973 | 23.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015JP02337 | 08.05.2015 | JP2014098815 | 12.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3145183 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2017 | A4 | EP3145183 | 22.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015JP02337 | 08.05.2015 | JP2014098815 | 12.05.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015174050 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014098815 | 12.05.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6304628B | Global Dossier | 04.04.2018 | B2 | JP2015215510 | 03.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014098815 | 12.05.2014 |