EP3143036 - PAR-1 BASED THERAPEUTIC CONJUGATES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tel Hashomer Medical Research Infrastructure and Services Ltd. The Chaim Sheba Medical Center 52621 Ramat Gan / IL | [2017/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAPMAN, Joab 24 Remez Street 55212 Kiryat Ono / IL | 02 /
SHAVIT-STEIN, Efrat 13 Tritch Street 69860 Tel Aviv / IL | [2017/12] | Representative(s) | Gassner, Birgitta, et al REDL Life Science Patent Attorneys Donau-City-Straße 11 1220 Wien / AT | [2017/12] | Application number, filing date | 15793541.2 | 11.05.2015 | [2017/12] | WO2015IL50488 | Priority number, date | US201461991532P | 11.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461991532 P | US201562137846P | 25.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562137846 P | [2017/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015173802 | Date: | 19.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3143036 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3143036 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 19.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/02, C07K5/02, A61K38/04, A61P25/00 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K38/1796 (US);
A61K31/519 (EP);
A61K38/57 (US);
A61K47/54 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
C07K14/723 (EP,US);
C07K5/0806 (EP,US);
C07K5/0819 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PAR-1-BASIERTE THERAPEUTISCHE KONJUGATE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2017/12] | English: | PAR-1 BASED THERAPEUTIC CONJUGATES AND USES THEREOF | [2017/12] | French: | CONJUGUÉS THÉRAPEUTIQUES À BASE DE PAR-1 ET UTILISATIONS CORRESPONDANTES | [2017/12] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/12] | 02.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 02.11.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 02.11.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4161522 (HAMBURGER ROBERT N [US]) [I] 1-3,5-7,9 * column 5, line 18 - line 41; examples 1, 8b, 10, 11; claims 1, 2 *; | [A]EP1806141 (KOWA CO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-8 *; | [A]WO2011039584 (TSOPANOGLOU NIKOS [GR], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-3; sequences 1, 4 *; | [A] - SAMUEL CHACKALAMANNIL, "G-Protein Coupled Receptor Antagonists-1: Protease Activated Receptor-1 (PAR-1) Antagonists as Novel Cardiovascular Therapeutic Agents (Hot Topic: Structure and property Approaches in Recent Drug Discovery Guest Editor: Guo Zhu Zheng)", CURRENT TOPICS IN MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (20030501), vol. 3, no. 10, doi:10.2174/1568026033452122, ISSN 1568-0266, pages 1115 - 1123, XP055094137 [A] 1-15 * tables 1, 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1568026033452122 | International search | [A]CA2340461 (UNIV MANITOBA [CA]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph 0032, examples 3 and 4, table 1 *; | [A]WO02071847 (UNIV EMORY [US], et al) [A] 1-20* FIG. 3, example 2 *; | [A]WO2011039584 (TSOPANOGLOU NIKOS [GR], et al) [A] 1-20 * SEQ ID NO 4 *; | [A]WO2013070256 (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document, especially paragraph 0062 *; | [A]WO2013173676 (TUFTS MEDICAL CT INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * table on page 12, page 9 lines 9-20, page 18 lines 6-15 * | by applicant | US2004092535 | US2007142272 | US2009176803 | US2009281100 | US7842716 | US8232295 | US2012232097 | - SHAVIT et al., Brain, (20080000), vol. 131, no. 4, pages 1113 - 1122 | - SHAVIT et al., J Neurochem., vol. 119, no. 3, pages 460 - 473 |