EP3215357 - METHOD OF PRODUCING FIBRE-REINFORCED COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/37] | FIBRE-REINFORCED COMPONENTS | ||
[2024/09] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McLaren Automotive Limited McLaren Technology Centre Chertsey Road Woking Surrey GU21 4YH / GB | [2024/39] |
Former [2017/37] | For all designated states McLaren Automotive Limited McLaren Technology Centre Chertsey Road Woking Surrey GU 21 4YH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEEKS, Graham c/o McLaren Automotive Limited McLaren Technology Centre Chertsey Road Woking Surrey GU21 4YH / GB | 02 /
SANTONI, Claudio c/o McLaren Automotive Limited McLaren Technology Centre Chertsey Road Woking Surrey GU21 4YH / GB | [2017/37] | Representative(s) | Slingsby Partners LLP 1 Kingsway London WC2B 6AN / GB | [2017/37] | Application number, filing date | 15794262.4 | 09.11.2015 | [2017/37] | WO2015GB53386 | Priority number, date | GB20140019902 | 07.11.2014 Original published format: GB 201419902 | [2017/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016071719 | Date: | 12.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3215357 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3215357 | Date: | 25.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/76, B29C70/86, B29C70/08, B29C70/12, B29C45/14, B62D29/04, B29C43/18 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
B29C70/76 (EP,US);
B29C70/86 (US);
B29C43/18 (EP,US);
B29C45/14418 (EP,US);
B29C45/14786 (EP,US);
B29C70/081 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/37] | B29C70/76, B29C70/86, B29C70/08, B29C45/14, B62D29/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELUNG FASERVERSTÄRKTE BAUTEILE | [2024/09] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING FIBRE-REINFORCED COMPONENTS | [2024/09] | French: | METHODE DE FABRICATION DE COMPOSANTS RENFORCÉS PAR FIBRES | [2024/09] |
Former [2017/37] | FASERVERSTÄRKTE BAUTEILE | ||
Former [2017/37] | FIBRE-REINFORCED COMPONENTS | ||
Former [2017/37] | COMPOSANTS RENFORCÉS PAR FIBRES | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/37] | 01.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24196278.6 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   04.01.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4721342 (DANIELS VERNON A [US], et al); | [A]WO9006226 (BEHAR ISAAC [FR]); | [X]WO9952703 (RCC REGIONAL COMPACT CAR AG [CH], et al); | [A]GB2378915 (LOTUS CAR [GB]); | [X]WO03057529 (HYPERCAR INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2004024424 (RCC REGIONAL COMPACT CAR AG [CH], et al) |