EP3227854 - IMAGING DEVICE, APPARATUS, AND IMAGING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2017/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKADA, Shunji c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
KOSAKAI, Ryota c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
UKITA, Shinji c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 04 /
OBA, Eiji c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 05 /
MASUZAWA, Tsuyoshi c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 06 /
EBIHARA, Masakazu c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 07 /
SHIMAUCHI, Kazuhiro c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2017/41] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/41] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 15794319.2 | 21.10.2015 | [2017/41] | WO2015JP05314 | Priority number, date | JP20140246172 | 04.12.2014 Original published format: JP 2014246172 | [2017/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016088293 | Date: | 09.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3227854 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00, G06T5/50 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
G06T5/90 (EP,US);
H04N5/33 (US);
G06T5/50 (EP,US);
H04N23/13 (US);
H04N23/21 (EP);
H04N23/84 (EP,US);
H04N9/44 (US);
H04N9/64 (US);
G06T2207/10048 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30196 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30201 (EP,US);
G06T3/4053 (US);
H04N2209/048 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] | Title | German: | BILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VORRICHTUNG UND BILDGEBUNGSVERFAHREN | [2017/41] | English: | IMAGING DEVICE, APPARATUS, AND IMAGING METHOD | [2017/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE, APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ D'IMAGERIE | [2017/41] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 12.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]JP2008183933 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]US2010019151 (SHIMIZU SEIYA [JP]); | [Y]JP2011066809 (HITACHI INT ELECTRIC INC); | by applicant | JP2004192129 |