Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3223596 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2023 | C0 | EP3223596 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2023 | B1 | EP3223596 | 04.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NL2013881 | 26.11.2014 | WO2015NL50641 | 17.09.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016085328 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NL2013881 | 26.11.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NL2015451B | 29.11.2016 | B1 | NL2015451 | 20.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | NL2013881 | 26.11.2014 |