EP3223596 - COVERING SYSTEM FOR COVERING A SPACE, FOR INSTANCE FOR STORING BULK MATERIALS, FOR INSTANCE SILAGE, MOUNTING MEANS FOR THE COVERING SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR FORMING A COVERING SYSTEM FOR COVERING THE SPACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/40] | COVERING SYSTEM FOR COVERING A SPACE, FOR INSTANCE FOR STORING BULK MATERIALS, FOR INSTANCE SILAGE, MOUNTING MEANS FOR THE COVERING SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR FORMING A COVERING SYSTEM FOR COVERING THE SPACE | ||
[2023/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brokers Covering B.V. Marconistraat 29 7651 DE Tubbergen / NL | [2020/47] |
Former [2017/40] | For all designated states TenCate Geosynthetics Netherlands B.V. Hoge Dijkje 2 7442 AE Nijverdal / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHROOTEN, Stephanus Gerardus Johannes Marconistraat 29 NL-7651 DE Tubbergen / NL | 02 /
HEEZEN, Jan-Willem p/a. Hoge Dijkje 2 7442 AE Nijverdal / NL | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2017/40] | Application number, filing date | 15794659.1 | 17.09.2015 | [2017/40] | WO2015NL50641 | Priority number, date | NL20142013881 | 26.11.2014 Original published format: NL 2013881 | [2017/40] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016085328 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3223596 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3223596 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A01F25/13, A01F25/16 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
A01F25/13 (EP);
A01F25/166 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABDECKSYSTEM ZUM ABDECKEN EINES RAUMES WIE Z. B. ZUM LAGERN VON SCHÜTTGUT WIE Z. B. SILOFUTTER, MONTAGEMITTEL FÜR DAS ABDECKSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ABDECKSYSTEMS FÜR DEN RAUM | [2017/40] | English: | COVERING SYSTEM FOR COVERING A SPACE, FOR INSTANCE FOR STORING BULK MATERIALS, FOR INSTANCE SILAGE, MOUNTING MEANS FOR THE COVERING SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR FORMING A COVERING SYSTEM FOR COVERING THE SPACE | [2023/10] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COUVERTURE POUR RECOUVRIR UN ESPACE DESTINÉ, PAR EXEMPLE, AU STOCKAGE DE MATÉRIAUX EN VRAC, PAR EXEMPLE, DE FOURRAGE ENSILÉ, MOYENS DE MONTAGE POUR SYSTÈME DE COUVERTURE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FORMER UN SYSTÈME DE COUVERTURE DESTINÉ À RECOUVRIR L'ESPACE | [2017/40] |
Former [2017/40] | COVERING SYSTEM FOR COVERING A SPACE, FOR INSTANCE FOR STORING BULK MATERIALS, FOR INSTANCE SILAGE, MOUNTING MEANS FOR THE COVERING SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR FORMING A COVERING SYSTEM FOR COVERING THE SPACE | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 23.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | MC | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | IE | 17.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | GB | 26.10.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
IE | 17.09.2023 | ||
GB | 26.10.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 26.10.2023 | |
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 26.10.2023 | |
GR | 27.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US989624 (MARTIN FREDERICK W [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1 ** page 1 - page 2 *; | [Y]US3857210 (AUSTIN H) [Y] 1-10,16-19 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 13 - column 60 *; | [Y]US3991718 (STINNES WOLF WALTER) [Y] 16-19 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 50 *; | [A]US4041654 (NEDILA WALTER) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 36-54; figure 2 *; | [I]US4691957 (ELLINGSON HARTLEY [US]) [I] 11-16 * figures 2,4,9 * * column 2, line 56 - column 6, line 2 *; | [Y]WO2012006673 (INNOTECH PTY LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 1-10,16-19 * figure 1 * * page 8, line 25 - page 21, line 15 * |