EP3221276 - FIRE RESISTANT CALCIUM SULPHATE-BASED PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Placo 34 Avenue Franklin Roosevelt 92150 Suresnes / FR | [2017/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROOKS, Laura BPB United Kingdom Ltd Technical Centre East Leake Loughborough Leicestershire LE12 6JT / GB | 02 /
FISHER, Robin BPB United Kingdom Ltd Technical Centre East Leake Loughborough Leicestershire LE12 6JT / GB | 03 /
RIDEOUT, Jan BPB United Kingdom Ltd Technical Centre East Leake Loughborough Leicestershire LE12 6JT / GB | [2017/39] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/39] | Oxley, Rachel Louise Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 15794949.6 | 17.11.2015 | [2017/39] | WO2015EP76788 | Priority number, date | GB20140020770 | 21.11.2014 Original published format: GB 201420770 | [2017/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016079101 | Date: | 26.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3221276 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/14, C04B111/00, C04B111/28 | [2017/39] | CPC: |
C04B28/14 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C01F11/46 (US);
C04B14/42 (KR);
C04B24/42 (KR);
C04B2111/00612 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C04B2111/28 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08G77/04 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/14, C04B14/38, C04B24/42 (CN,EP,US);
C04B28/14, C04B14/42, C04B24/42 (US,CN,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] | Title | German: | FLAMMBESTÄNDIGE PRODUKTE BASIEREND AUF CALCIUMSULFAT | [2017/39] | English: | FIRE RESISTANT CALCIUM SULPHATE-BASED PRODUCTS | [2017/39] | French: | PRODUITS À BASE DE SULFATE DE CALCIUM RÉSISTANT AU FEU | [2017/39] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/39] | 21.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/47] | 15.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]AU5584480 (AUSTRALIAN GYPSUM) [I] 20,22,23* the whole document *; | [X]EP2604402 (SAINT GOBAIN PLACO SAS [FR]) [X] 11 * paragraph [0027] *; | [XI]CN103708791 (QINGDAO HIBOUND CHENGYUAN PLASTIC CO LTD) [X] 1-8,12-15,17,24-27 * the whole document * [I] 9,10,16,18,19; | [X]CN103755209 (UNIV CHINA MINING) [X] 1-8,13-15,24-27 * the whole document * | Examination | CN103556735 |