EP3237850 - FLOWMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endress+Hauser Flowtec AG Kägenstrasse 7 4153 Reinach / CH | [2017/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRETZLER, Timo Mühlenstraße 70 79589 Binzen / DE | 02 /
KOLLMER, Daniel Breitmattstr. 6 79689 Maulburg / DE | [2017/44] | Representative(s) | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser Group Services (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/44] | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 15795196.3 | 18.11.2015 | [2017/44] | WO2015EP76924 | Priority number, date | DE201410119512 | 23.12.2014 Original published format: DE102014119512 | [2017/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016102123 | Date: | 30.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3237850 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/66, G01F15/02, G01F15/04 | [2017/44] | CPC: |
G01F1/666 (EP,CN,US);
G01N29/036 (US);
G01F1/588 (US);
G01F1/60 (US);
G01F15/022 (EP,CN,US);
G01F15/043 (EP,CN,US);
G01N29/222 (US);
G01N2291/021 (US);
G01N2291/022 (US);
G01N2291/02836 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCHFLUSSMESSGERÄT | [2017/44] | English: | FLOWMETER | [2017/44] | French: | DEBITMÈTRE | [2017/44] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/44] | 17.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.01.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4317187 (KOLB HANS PROF DR [DE]) [A] 1-11 * column 6, line 12 - line 58 *; | [X]JP2004077248 (TOKYO GAS CO LTD) [X] 1,3-7 * abstract *; | [XI]US2011037598 (DAY DONALD [US]) [X] 1,3,8-11 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1-3 * [I] 2; | [A]DE102009054308 (AQUA FAIR GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0013] ** abstract * | by applicant | DE102007007812 |