Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
16.02.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
29.11.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.09.2017 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
29.09.2017 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
29.09.2017 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
04.09.2017 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.05.2017 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.05.2017 | Change - representative | |
18.05.2017 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.07.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.07.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.11.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication |