EP3147279 - CAROTENOID DERIVATIVE, PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALT THEREOF, AND PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE ESTER OR AMIDE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Chemical Industries Co., Ltd. 55, Yokohoonji Kamiichi-machi Nakaniikawa-gun, Toyama 930-0397 / JP | [2022/01] |
Former [2018/40] | For all designated states Asta Pharmaceuticals Co., Ltd. 55, Yokohoonji Kamiichi-machi Nakaniikawa-gun Toyama 930-0397 / JP | ||
Former [2017/13] | For all designated states Fuji Chemical Industry Co., Ltd. 55 Yokohoonji Kamiichi-machi Nakaniikawa-gun, Toyama 930-0397 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJITA, Takashi c/o Fuji Chemical Industries Co., Ltd. 55 Yokohoonji Kamiichi-machi Nakaniikawa-gun Toyama 930-0397 / JP | 02 /
KOBAYASHI, Satoshi c/o Fuji Chemical Industries Co., Ltd. 55 Yokohoonji Kamiichi-machi Nakaniikawa-gun Toyama 930-0397 / JP | 03 /
SHINOHARA, Ryoma c/o Fuji Chemical Industries Co., Ltd. 55 Yokohoonji Kamiichi-machi Nakaniikawa-gun Toyama 930-0397 / JP | 04 /
NISHIDA, Yasuhiro c/o Fuji Chemical Industries Co., Ltd. 55 Yokohoonji Kamiichi-machi Nakaniikawa-gun Toyama 930-0397 / JP | 05 /
TAKAHASHI, Jiro c/o Fuji Chemical Industries Co., Ltd. 55 Yokohoonji Kamiichi-machi Nakaniikawa-gun Toyama 930-0397 / JP | [2017/13] | Representative(s) | Blodig, Wolfgang Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [2017/13] | Application number, filing date | 15795815.8 | 20.05.2015 | [2017/13] | WO2015JP64408 | Priority number, date | JP20140104480 | 20.05.2014 Original published format: JP 2014104480 | JP20140247549 | 08.12.2014 Original published format: JP 2014247549 | [2017/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015178404 | Date: | 26.11.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3147279 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07C403/24, A61K31/22, A61K31/27, A61K31/4178, A61P3/04, A61P3/06, A61P9/04, A61P9/12, A61P21/00, A61P25/18, A61P25/24, A61P25/28, A61P27/00, A61P27/02, A61P27/06, A61P29/00, A61P35/00, C07D233/61 | [2017/13] | CPC: |
C07D233/61 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/22 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07C403/24 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/27 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/4178 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P21/00 (EP,RU);
A61P25/18 (EP,RU);
A61P25/24 (EP,RU);
A61P25/28 (EP,RU);
A61P27/00 (EP,RU);
A61P27/02 (EP,RU);
A61P27/04 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP,RU);
A61P29/00 (EP,RU);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP,RU);
A61P3/06 (EP,RU);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,RU);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/13] | Title | German: | CAROTENOIDDERIVAT, PHARMAZEUTISCH UNBEDENKLICHES SALZ DAVON UND PHARMAZEUTISCH UNBEDENKLICHES ESTER UND AMID DAVON | [2017/13] | English: | CAROTENOID DERIVATIVE, PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALT THEREOF, AND PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE ESTER OR AMIDE THEREOF | [2017/13] | French: | DÉRIVÉ DE CAROTÉNOÏDE, SEL PHARMACEUTIQUEMENT ACCEPTABLE DE CE DERNIER ET ESTER OU AMIDE PHARMACEUTIQUEMENT ACCEPTABLE DE CE DERNIER | [2017/13] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2016 | Translation filed | 07.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/13] | 07.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/16] | 21.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 10.12.2020 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2021/42] | 01.12.2021 | Resumption of proceedings | [2021/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2005102356 (HAWAII BIOTECH INC [US], et al); | [I]WO2006099015 (HAWAII BIOTECH INC [US], et al); | [I]WO2006105214 (HAWAII BIOTECH INC [US], et al); | [I]WO2006119168 (HAWAII BIOTECH INC [US], et al); | [I]WO2008106606 (CARDAX PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [I]WO2008118862 (CARDAX PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | International search | [A]JP2005517010 ; | [A]JP2006517197 ; | [A]JP2007176814 (FUTAMURA YOSHIHIRO); | [A]JP2010248243 (CARDAX PHARMACEUTICALS INC); | [A]JP2013518856 |