EP3146246 - PRESSURE PUMPING VALVES AND METHODS OF MAKING SUCH VALVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smith International, Inc. 1310 Rankin Road Houston, TX 77073 / US | [2017/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FILIPOW, Sean 2005 Hickory Str. Houston, Texas 77007 / US | 02 /
SINGH, Manjinder 14763 Meadowsweet Dr. Corona, California 92880 / US | 03 /
LACOMBE, Kevin 33637 Sterling Ponds Blvd Sterling Heights, Michigan 48312 / US | 04 /
OWINGS, Derek 33637 Sterling Ponds Blvd Sterling Heights, Michigan 48312 / US | 05 /
FERNHOLZ, David 33637 Sterling Ponds Blvd Sterling Heights, Michigan 48312 / US | 06 /
FITZPATRICK, Michael 33637 Sterling Ponds Blvd Sterling Heights, Michigan 48312 / US | [2017/13] | Representative(s) | Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department Parkstraat 83 2514 JG Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/13] | Schlumberger Cambridge Research Limited Intellectual Property Law High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 15795920.6 | 15.05.2015 | [2017/13] | WO2015US31058 | Priority number, date | US201462000402P | 19.05.2014 Original published format: US 201462000402 P | [2017/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015179234 | Date: | 26.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3146246 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16K15/02, F16K1/36, B23K1/008, F16K1/48, F04B53/10, F16K15/06 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
F16K1/36 (EP,US);
B23K1/0008 (US);
B23K1/008 (EP,US);
C21D9/0068 (EP,US);
C21D9/50 (EP,US);
F04B53/1025 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/13] | F16K15/02, F16K1/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/13] | Title | German: | DRUCKPUMPENVENTILE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2017/13] | English: | PRESSURE PUMPING VALVES AND METHODS OF MAKING SUCH VALVES | [2017/13] | French: | VALVES DE POMPAGE DE PRESSION ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2017/13] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/13] | 10.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/13] | 07.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4675966 (FRANCO-FERREIRA EDGARD A [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]CN201787094U (CHENGDE JIANGZUAN PETROLEUM MACHINERY CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2003015240 (NELSON DONALD R [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * paragraph [0039]; figure - *; | [A]US5062450 (BAILEY THOMAS F [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * the whole document * | International search | [XY]US2005103386 (MAGDA MARK [US]) [X] 16, 18, 20 * See paragraphs [0024], [0028]-[0031] and figures 1-2. * [Y] 1-15, 17, 19; | [Y]US4945630 (GELLERT JOBST U [CA]) [Y] 1-15, 17, 19 * See column 4, line 32 - column 6, line 22 and figures 1-8. *; | [A]US3871339 (KUHN KARL WALTER) [A] 1-20 * See column 1, line 3 - column 3, line 23 and figures 1-2. *; | [A]US2009250525 (HABERMANN ROLF [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraph [0019] and figure 1. *; | [A]US5639062 (IRGENS CHRISTOPHER R [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See column 11, line 33 - column 12, line 7 and figures 11-12. * |