EP3147358 - METHOD FOR MONOMERIZING MATRIX METALLOPROTEINASE-7 (MMP-7) AGGREGATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KM Biologics Co., Ltd. 1-6-1 Okubo Kita-ku Kumamoto-shi Kumamoto 860-8568 / JP | [2018/46] |
Former [2017/13] | For all designated states The Chemo-Sero-Therapeutic Research Institute 1-6-1 Okubo Kita-ku Kumamoto-shi Kumamoto 860-8568 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKATAKE, Hiroshi c/o THE CHEMO-SERO-THERAPEUTIC RESEARCH INSTITUTE KIKUCHI RESEARCH CENTER 1314-1 Kyokushi Kawabe Kikuchi-shi Kumamoto 869-1298 / JP | 02 /
HIRASHIMA, Masaki c/o THE CHEMO-SERO-THERAPEUTIC RESEARCH INSTITUTE KIKUCHI RESEARCH CENTER 1314-1 Kyokushi Kawabe Kikuchi-shi Kumamoto 869-1298 / JP | 03 /
TAKEO, Hideki c/o THE CHEMO-SERO-THERAPEUTIC RESEARCH INSTITUTE 1-6-1 Okubo Kita-ku Kumamoto-shi Kumamoto 860-8568 / JP | 04 /
MATSUYAMA, Reiko c/o THE CHEMO-SERO-THERAPEUTIC RESEARCH INSTITUTE KIKUCHI RESEARCH CENTER 1314-1 Kyokushi Kawabe Kikuchi-shi Kumamoto 869-1298 / JP | 05 /
MORIKAWA, Wataru c/o THE CHEMO-SERO-THERAPEUTIC RESEARCH INSTITUTE KIKUCHI RESEARCH CENTER 1314-1 Kyokushi Kawabe Kikuchi-shi Kumamoto 869-1298 / JP | [2017/13] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2017/13] | Application number, filing date | 15795955.2 | 20.05.2015 | [2017/13] | WO2015JP64451 | Priority number, date | JP20140105452 | 21.05.2014 Original published format: JP 2014105452 | [2017/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015178414 | Date: | 26.11.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3147358 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/64, A61K38/46, A61K47/02, A61K47/10, A61K47/16, A61K47/26, A61P19/00, A61P25/00, C12N9/96, A61K38/48, C12N15/52 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
C12N9/96 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C12N9/64 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/46 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/4886 (EP,RU,US);
A61K47/02 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/16 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,KR,US);
A61P19/00 (EP,RU);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
C12N15/52 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/13] | C12N9/64, A61K38/46, A61K47/02, A61K47/10, A61K47/16, A61K47/26, A61P19/00, A61P25/00, C12N9/96 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MONOMERISIERUNG EINES MATRIXMETALLOPROTEINASE-7-AGGREGATS (MMP-7) | [2017/13] | English: | METHOD FOR MONOMERIZING MATRIX METALLOPROTEINASE-7 (MMP-7) AGGREGATE | [2017/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MONOMÉRISATION D'UN AGRÉGAT DE MÉTALLOPROTÉINASE-7 MATRICIELLE (MMP -7) | [2017/13] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2016 | Translation filed | 16.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/13] | 16.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6194189 (SENIOR ROBERT M [US]) [X] 1-10,17,19,20 * column 6, line 25 - line 44 * [I] 11-16,18,21,22; | [XI] - YU W-H ET AL, "Heparan sulfate proteoglycans as extracellular docking molecules for matrilysin (matrix metalloproteinase 7)", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, US, (20000211), vol. 275, no. 6, doi:10.1074/JBC.275.6.4183, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 4183 - 4191, XP002310584 [X] 1-3,8,10,17,19,20 * abstract * * page 4184, column r, paragraph 3 * * page 4185, column r, paragraph 3 * [I] 4-7,9,11-16,18,21,22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.275.6.4183 | International search | [A]JPH10276774 (TOYO BOSEKI) [A] 1-46 * , claims; paragraph [0006] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2000344672 (MEIJI MILK PROD CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-46 * , paragraph [0028] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2005006509 (ARKRAY INC) [A] 1-46 * , paragraph [0027] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2005528109 (Astex Technology Ltd.) [A] 1-46 * , paragraph [0020] & US 2004/0243319 A1 & WO 2003/102192 A1 & EP 1509608 A2 *; | [YA]JP2008206491 (TOYO BOSEKI) [Y] 1, 2, 4, 7-14, 16-27, 29-37, 39-46 * , claims (Family: none) * [A] 3, 5, 6, 15, 28, 38; | [YA]JP2009517086 (Biomatrica, Inc.) [Y] 1, 2, 4, 7-14, 16-27, 29-37, 39-46 * , claims; paragraph [0043] & US 2006/0099567 A1 & WO 2005/113147 A2 & EP 1951868 A2 * [A] 3, 5, 6, 15, 28, 38; | [YA]WO2010047347 (CHEMO SERO THERAPEUT RES INST [JP], et al) [Y] 1, 2, 4, 7-14, 16-27, 29-37, 39-46 * , examples 4, 5 & US 2011/0262998 A1 & EP 2363469 A1 * [A] 3, 5, 6, 15, 28, 38; | [YA]WO2012167271 (BAXTER INT [US], et al) [Y] 1, 2, 4, 7-14, 16-27, 29-37, 39-46 * , claims & JP 2014-519506 A & US 2012/0329128 A1 & EP 2714087 A2 * [A] 3, 5, 6, 15, 28, 38; | [YA]JP2013518893 (Biomarin Pharmaceutical Inc.) [Y] 1, 2, 4, 7-14, 16-27, 29-37, 39-46 * , claims; paragraph [0162] & US 2013/0039898 A1 & WO 2011/097335 A2 & EP 2531209 A1 * [A] 3, 5, 6, 15, 28, 38; | [XYA] - LOPEZ DE TURISO J et al., "Expression and purification of human matrilysin produced in baculovirus-infected insect cells", J. Biotechnol., (19960000), vol. 46, no. 3, ISSN 0168-1656, pages 235 - 241, XP004036792 [X] 1, 2, 4, 7-13, 22, 23 [Y] 14, 16-21, 24-27, 29-37, 39-46 [A] 3, 5, 6, 15, 28, 38 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-1656(96)00002-8 | [YA] - HARO H, "Translational research of herniated discs: current status of diagnosis and treatment", J. Orthop. Sci., (20140700), vol. 19, no. 4, ISSN 0949-2658, pages 515 - 520, XP055238066 [Y] 1, 2, 4, 7-14, 16-27, 29-37, 39-46 [A] 3, 5, 6, 15, 28, 38 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00776-014-0571-x | [YA] - OU L et al., "The expression and refolding of isotopically labeled recombinant Matrilysin for NMR studies", Protein Expr. Purif., (20060000), vol. 47, no. 2, ISSN 1046-5928, pages 367 - 373, XP024908753 [Y] 1, 2, 4, 7-14, 16-27, 29-37, 39-46 [A] 3, 5, 6, 15, 28, 38 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pep.2006.01.016 | [YA] - KANNAN R et al., "Purification of active matrix metalloproteinase catalytic domains and its use for screening of specific stromelysin-3 inhibitors", Protein Expr. Purif., (19990000), vol. 16, no. 1, ISSN 1046-5928, pages 76 - 83, XP004441684 [Y] 1, 2, 4, 7-14, 16-27, 29-37, 39-46 [A] 3, 5, 6, 15, 28, 38 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/prep.1999.1068 | [YA] - BROWNER MF et al., "Matrilysin-inhibitor complexes: common themes among metalloproteases", Biochemistry, (19950000), vol. 34, no. 20, pages 6602 - 6610, XP000983457 [Y] 26, 27, 29-37, 39-46 [A] 1-25, 28, 38 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00020a004 | [A] - BARNETT J et al., "Production, purification, and characterization of human matrilysin (PUMP) from recombinant Chinese hamster ovary cells", Protein Expr. Purif., (19940000), vol. 5, no. 1, ISSN 1046-5928, pages 27 - 36, XP024799933 [A] 1-46 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/prep.1994.1004 | [A] - KIHIRA Y et al., "Production of recombinant human matrix metalloproteinase 7 (Matrilysin) with potential role in tumor invasion by refolding from Escherichia coli inclusion bodies and development of sandwich ELISA of MMP-7", Urol. Oncol., (19960000), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 20 - 26, XP055238069 [A] 1-46 | [A] - ZHOU JH et al., "Autoantibodies against MMP-7 as a novel diagnostic biomarker in esophageal squamous cell carcinoma", World J. Gastroenterol., (20110000), vol. 17, no. 10, ISSN 1007-9327, pages 1373 - 1378, XP055238070 [A] 1-46 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3748/wjg.v17.i10.1373 | [A] - INOUYE K et al., "States of tryptophyl residues and stability of recombinant human matrix metalloproteinase 7 (matrilysin) as examined by fluorescence", J. Biochem., (20000000), vol. 128, no. 3, pages 363 - 369, XP055238071 [A] 1-46 | [A] - SAMUKANGE V et al., "Effects of heparin and cholesterol sulfate on the activity and stability of human matrix metalloproteinase 7", Bioscience, biotechnology, and biochemistry, (20140000), vol. 78, no. 1, ISSN 0916-8451, pages 41 - 48, XP055238072 [A] 1-46 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/09168451.2014.878213 | [A] - CRABBE T et al., "Biochemical characterization of matrilysin. Activation conforms to the stepwise mechanisms proposed for other matrix metalloproteinases", Biochemistry, (19920000), vol. 31, no. 36, pages 8500 - 8507, XP055238073 [A] 1-46 | [A] - ONEDA H et al., "Refolding and recovery of recombinant human matrix metalloproteinase 7 (matrilysin) from inclusion bodies expressed by Escherichia coli", J. Biochem., (19990000), vol. 126, no. 5, ISSN 0021-924x, pages 905 - 911, XP055238074 [A] 1-46 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/oxfordjournals.jbchem.a022533 |