EP3148086 - DATA-PROCESSING DEVICE AND DATA PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2017/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEGAYA Ryoji c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO Makiko c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
SHINOHARA Yuji c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2017/13] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/13] | Application number, filing date | 15796074.1 | 08.05.2015 | [2017/13] | WO2015JP63249 | Priority number, date | JP20140104805 | 21.05.2014 Original published format: JP 2014104805 | [2017/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015178211 | Date: | 26.11.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3148086 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/27, H03M13/03, H03M13/11, H03M13/25, H03M13/29, H03M13/35, H04L1/00 | [2018/05] | CPC: |
H04L1/0057 (EP,US);
H03M13/2792 (US);
H03M13/036 (EP,US);
H03M13/1102 (US);
H03M13/1137 (EP,US);
H03M13/1165 (EP,US);
H03M13/255 (EP,US);
H03M13/271 (EP,US);
H03M13/2778 (EP,US);
H03M13/2906 (EP,US);
H03M13/356 (EP,US);
H03M13/616 (US);
H04L1/0041 (US);
H03M13/152 (EP,US);
H03M13/6552 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/13] | H03M13/19, H03M13/27 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/13] | Title | German: | DATENVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND DATENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2017/13] | English: | DATA-PROCESSING DEVICE AND DATA PROCESSING METHOD | [2017/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES | [2017/13] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2016 | Translation filed | 15.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2016 | Examination requested [2017/13] | 15.01.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2560310 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0060] * * figures 8-14,21,24-26 * * claims 4-12 *; | [E]EP3148084 (SONY CORP [JP]) [E] 1-4 * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0127] * * paragraphs [0290] , [0294] * * paragraph [0481] - paragraph [0486] * * paragraphs [0594] , [0595] , [0625] * * paragraph [0710] - paragraph [0724] * * paragraph [0793] - paragraph [0806] * * figures 9-12,17,32,145,208,209,216 *; | [A] - "Digital Video Broadcasting (DVB); Next Generation broadcasting system to Handheld, physical layer specification (DVB-NGH)", ETSI EN 302 755 V1.3.1, (20121130), XP055248828 [A] 1-4 * pages 52,53 * * page 220 - page 224 * * page 245 - page 251 * | [T] - DVB ORGANIZATION, "S32-230r21-PHY-STD-CS.pdf", DVB, DIGITAL VIDEO BROADCASTING, C/O EBU - 17A ANCIENNE ROUTE - CH-1218 GRAND SACONNEX, GENEVA - SWITZERLAND, (20151011), XP017846934 [T] * page 32 - page 40 * * page 157 - page 183 * | International search | [A]JP2007006494 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * , claims 1 to 4 & US 2007/0011570 A1 & EP 1737133 A1 & KR 10-2006-0133924 A & CN 1983861 A *; | [A]JP2011523318 (Thomson Licensing) [A] 1-12 * , claims 1 to 7 & US 2011/0090948 A1 & WO 2009/150500 A1 & EP 2134051 A1 & EP 2297911 A & CN 102067545 A *; | [A]JP2013005124 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-12 * , fig. 8 to 13, 33 to 49 & US 2014/0082452 A1 & WO 2012/173061 A1 & EP 2722994 A1 & TW 201308913 A & AU 2012270714 A & CN 103765782 A & KR 10-2014-0035386 A *; | [A] - GUARNERI, "Communications, ATSC 3.0 Physical Layer Proposal Rev. 01 ANNEX A", The Performance of Single Carrier Multi-Tone(SCMT) Modulation, (20131117), URL: http://www.guarneri-communications.com/wp-content/uploads/2014/04/ATSC-3-PROPOSAL_anex-A.pdf, (20150529), XP055224951 [A] 1-12 |