EP3147576 - DYNAMIC HEATING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.12.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.01.2019 [2019/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Exploded View, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 127- 2°C 28046 Madrid / ES | [2017/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTÍ FIBLA, Lluc C/ Caragola, 26 43530 Alcanar (Tarragona) / ES | 02 /
MARTIN SERRANO, Lara C/ Caragola, 26 43530 Alcanar (Tarragona) / ES | [2017/13] | Representative(s) | Pons Ariño, Angel Pons Patentes y Marcas Internacional, S.L. Glorieta Rubén Dario 4 28010 Madrid / ES | [2017/13] | Application number, filing date | 15796700.1 | 15.05.2015 | [2017/13] | WO2015ES70389 | Priority number, date | ES20140030723 | 19.05.2014 Original published format: ES 201430723 | [2017/13] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015177390 | Date: | 26.11.2015 | Language: | ES | [2015/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3147576 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 26.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F24D13/02, E01C11/26 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
E01C11/26 (US);
E01C11/265 (US);
F24D13/02 (EP,US);
F24D13/024 (EP,US);
H01R13/502 (US);
H05B1/0277 (EP,US);
H05B3/283 (EP,US);
H05B2203/007 (EP,US);
H05B2203/016 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/13] | F24D13/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/13] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHES HEIZSYSTEM | [2017/13] | English: | DYNAMIC HEATING SYSTEM | [2017/13] | French: | SYSTÈME DYNAMIQUE DE CHAUFFAGE | [2017/13] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2016 | Translation filed | 23.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/13] | 23.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/05] | 10.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]WO2009061111 (LEE SANG JUN [KR], et al) [I] 1 * page 4 - page 5; figures 6,11 * * page 8, line 16 - page 10, line 4 * * page 17, line 2 - page 19, line 25 * [Y] 1-5; | [IY]EP2546431 (RIMONDINI LAMBERTO [IT]) [I] 1 * paragraphs [0031] , [0056] , [0068] - [0071] - [0074] - [0076]; figures 1,2,5 * [Y] 1-5; | [Y]EP0150448 (MORALT HOLZWERKSTOFFE [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * page 5 - page 7 *; | [Y]EP2679486 (AIRBUS OPERATIONS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0041] - [0044]; figures 1-3 * | International search | [A]EP1088373 (GRAND MARKET GLOBALIZERS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-5 * , figures 2 - 4, paragraphs [10 - 25]. *; | [A]US3223825 (WILLIAMS CHESTER I) [A] 1, 5 * , the whole document. *; | [A]WO2010092456 (MONTANARI FABRIZIO [IT]) [A] 1, 5 * , the whole document. *; | [A]US6943320 (BAVETT STEVEN T M [US]) [A] 1, 5 * , the whole document. * |