Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10195939 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2019 | B2 | US2017313187 | 02.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP75790 | 05.11.2015 | DE102014016451 | 06.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107074105B | Global Dossier | 14.06.2019 | B | CN107074105 | 18.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP75790 | 05.11.2015 | DE102014016451 | 06.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3215390 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2018 | B1 | EP3215390 | 13.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP75790 | 05.11.2015 | DE102014016451 | 06.11.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016071436 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102014016451 | 06.11.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102014016451 | 24.03.2016 | B3 | Priority number | Date | DE102014016451 | 06.11.2014 |