EP3224034 - CASTING MOLD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF OPHTHALMIC LENSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcon Inc. Rue Louis-d'Affry 6 1701 Fribourg / CH | [2020/09] |
Former [2017/40] | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOF, Jens Schlesierstrasse 5 63868 Grosswallstadt / DE | 02 /
DIETRICH, Burkhard Bertha von Suttnerstrasse 1 40789 Monheim / DE | 03 /
BIEL, Roger Beethovenstrasse 4A 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | Bohest AG Holbeinstrasse 36-38 4051 Basel / CH | [2017/40] | Application number, filing date | 15797322.3 | 19.11.2015 | [2017/40] | WO2015EP77034 | Priority number, date | US201462084159P | 25.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462084159 P | [2017/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016083220 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3224034 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B29D11/00, // G02C7/04, G02C7/02 | [2024/33] | CPC: |
B29D11/00038 (EP,CN,US);
B29D11/0048 (US);
B29D11/00057 (US);
B29D11/00182 (EP,CN,US);
B29D11/00336 (EP,CN,US);
B29D11/00519 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2017/40] | B29D11/00, G02C7/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Title | German: | GIESSFORM ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON OPHTALMISCHEN LINSEN | [2017/40] | English: | CASTING MOLD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF OPHTHALMIC LENSES | [2017/40] | French: | MOULE DE COULÉE POUR LA FABRICATION DE LENTILLES OPHTALMIQUES | [2017/40] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 20.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4268133 (FISCHER DAVID J, et al); | [XA]JPH08194193 (HOYA CORP); | [YA]US5744357 (WANG DANIEL TSU-FANG [US], et al); | [XA]US2001013921 (WU JONGLIANG [US], et al); | [XAI]JP2002113725 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]US2002195732 (CLARK MICHAEL J [US], et al); | [A]US2004233822 (KUWA TADAHIRO [JP]); | [XAY]EP2031432 (MENICON CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US2009102078 (GOODENOUGH NEIL G [GB], et al) |