EP3224275 - ANTIGEN BINDING MOLECULES COMPRISING A TNF FAMILY LIGAND TRIMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2021 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2017/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMANN, Maria Neugutstrasse 55 8600 Duebendorf / CH | 02 /
BRUENKER, Peter Burgwiesenstrasse 3c 8335 Hittnau / CH | 03 /
CLAUS, Christina Limmatauweg 3 5408 Ennetbaden / CH | 04 /
FERRARA KOLLER, Claudia Haenibueel 13 6300 Zug / CH | 05 /
GRAU-RICHARDS, Sandra Breitestrasse 16 8903 Birmensdorf ZH / CH | 06 /
KLEIN, Christian Chapfstrasse 26B 8906 Bonstetten / CH | 07 /
LEVITSKY, Viktor Wulikerstrasse 10 8903 Biermensdorf / CH | 08 /
MOESSNER, Ekkehard Felsenburgweg 5 8280 Kreuzlingen / CH | 09 /
REGULA, Joerg Thomas Innerkoflerstrasse 17 B 81377 Muenchen / DE | 10 /
UMAÑA, Pablo Felsenrainstrasse 28 8832 Wollerau / CH | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | Klostermeyer-Rauber, Dörte, et al F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2017/40] | Klostermeyer-Rauber, Dörte, et al F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Corporate Law Patents (CLP) Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 15797922.0 | 13.11.2015 | [2017/40] | WO2015EP76528 | Priority number, date | EP20140193260 | 14.11.2014 Original published format: EP 14193260 | EP20150183736 | 03.09.2015 Original published format: EP 15183736 | EP20150188142 | 02.10.2015 Original published format: EP 15188142 | [2017/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016075278 | Date: | 19.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3224275 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3224275 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, C07K16/30, C07K16/40, C07K14/705, C07K16/28 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
C07K16/40 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/2803 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/00 (IL,US);
A61K39/395 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/6849 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K14/70575 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K14/70596 (IL,US);
C07K16/2815 (IL,US);
C07K16/2896 (IL,US);
C07K16/3007 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/46 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (IL,KR);
C07K2317/33 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/35 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/522 (IL,US);
C07K2317/524 (IL,US);
C07K2317/526 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/565 (IL,US);
C07K2317/60 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,IL,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/40] | C07K14/705, A61K47/50, C07K16/46, C12N15/62, C07K16/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 14.06.2017 | MD | 14.06.2017 | Title | German: | ANTIGENBINDENDE MOLEKÜLE MIT EINEM LIGANDENTRIMER DER TNF-FAMILIE | [2017/40] | English: | ANTIGEN BINDING MOLECULES COMPRISING A TNF FAMILY LIGAND TRIMER | [2017/40] | French: | MOLÉCULES DE LIAISON D'ANTIGÈNE COMPRENANT UN TRIMÈRE DE LIGAND DE LA FAMILLE TNF | [2019/35] |
Former [2017/40] | MOLÉCULES DE LIAISON À L'ANTIGÈNE COMPRENANT UN LIGAND TRIMÈRIQUE DE LA FAMILLE DU TNF | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 06.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18207248.8 / EP3489256 | EP20158607.0 / EP3738609 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 04.03.2020 | CY | 04.03.2020 | EE | 04.03.2020 | LV | 04.03.2020 | MC | 04.03.2020 | MK | 04.03.2020 | MT | 04.03.2020 | SM | 04.03.2020 | IS | 04.07.2020 | LU | 13.11.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/28] | CY | 04.03.2020 | |
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
MT | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
LU | 13.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | EE | 04.03.2020 | |
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
LU | 13.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | EE | 04.03.2020 | |
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | EE | 04.03.2020 | |
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | LV | 04.03.2020 | |
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | LV | 04.03.2020 | |
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | LV | 04.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2010010051 (APOGENIX GMBH [DE], et al); | [I]AU2011265482B (PROVIDENCE HEALTH & SERVICES OREGON [US]); |