Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10588545 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2020 | B2 | US2017354350 | 14.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP77341 | 23.11.2015 | EP14194494 | 24.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20170093158 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP77341 | 23.11.2015 | EP14194494 | 24.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6743007B | Global Dossier | 19.08.2020 | B2 | JP2018500963 | 18.01.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP77341 | 23.11.2015 | EP14194494 | 24.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107223038 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP77341 | 23.11.2015 | EP14194494 | 24.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3223684 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2022 | B1 | EP3223684 | 04.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP77341 | 23.11.2015 | EP14194494 | 24.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2717377 | 23.03.2020 | C2 | RU2017120967 | 22.04.2019 | A3 | RU2017120967 | 26.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP77341 | 23.11.2015 | EP14194494 | 24.11.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016083294 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14194494 | 24.11.2014 |