EP3224224 - CONDITIONING AGENT FOR A PARTICULATE FERTILIZER FOR REDUCING HYGROSCOPICITY AND DUST FORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YARA International ASA Drammensveien 131 0277 Oslo / NO | [2020/43] |
Former [2017/40] | For all designated states YARA International ASA P.O. Box 343 Skøyen 0213 Oslo / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OBRESTAD, Torstein Håvetveien 89 3830 Ulefoss / NO | 02 /
TANDE, Terje Hydalsveien 10 3970 Langesund / NO | [2020/43] |
Former [2017/40] | 01 /
OBRESTAD, Torstein Håvetveien 89 N-3830 Ulefoss / NO | ||
02 /
TANDE, Terje Hydalsveien 10 N-3970 Langesund / NO | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [2020/43] |
Former [2017/40] | Onsagers AS Munkedamsveien 35 P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 15798476.6 | 25.11.2015 | [2017/40] | WO2015EP77603 | Priority number, date | NO20140001420 | 26.11.2014 Original published format: NO 20141420 | [2017/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016083435 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3224224 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3224224 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C05G5/30, C05G3/20, C05C11/00, C05C9/00, C05C5/04, C05C5/00, C05C1/00, C05C3/00 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
B01J2/30 (EP,KR,NO,RU,US);
C05G5/37 (EP,CN,KR,NO,US);
C05G3/00 (RU);
C05G3/70 (KR);
C05C1/00 (EP,US);
C05C11/00 (EP,US);
C05C3/00 (CN);
C05C3/005 (EP,US);
C05C5/005 (EP,US);
C05C5/04 (EP,CN,US);
C05C9/00 (CN);
C05C9/005 (EP,US);
C05D9/00 (KR);
C05G3/20 (EP,CN,NO,RU,US);
C05G3/30 (EP,CN,NO,RU,US);
C05G5/12 (EP,CN,KR,NO,RU,US);
C05G5/30 (EP,CN,KR,NO,US);
C05G5/38 (EP,CN,KR,NO,US);
C09D191/06 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C05C3/00, C05G5/37, C05G5/38, C05G5/30, C05C9/00 (CN);
C05C5/04, C05G5/37, C05G5/38, C05G5/30 (CN);
C05C9/00, C05G5/30, C05G5/37, C05G5/38 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2017/40] | C05G3/00, B01J2/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONDITIONIERUNGSMITTEL FÜR EIN PARTIKELFÖRMIGES DÜNGEMITTEL ZUR VERMINDERUNG DER HYGROSKOPIZITÄT UND STAUBBILDUNG | [2017/40] | English: | CONDITIONING AGENT FOR A PARTICULATE FERTILIZER FOR REDUCING HYGROSCOPICITY AND DUST FORMATION | [2017/40] | French: | AGENT DE CONDITIONNEMENT POUR ENGRAIS PARTICULAIRE, DESTINÉ À RÉDUIRE L'HYGROSCOPICITÉ ET LA FORMATION DE POUSSIÈRE | [2017/40] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 01.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.11.2015 | AL | 21.10.2020 | AT | 21.10.2020 | CY | 21.10.2020 | CZ | 21.10.2020 | DK | 21.10.2020 | EE | 21.10.2020 | FI | 21.10.2020 | HR | 21.10.2020 | LT | 21.10.2020 | LV | 21.10.2020 | MC | 21.10.2020 | MK | 21.10.2020 | MT | 21.10.2020 | RS | 21.10.2020 | SI | 21.10.2020 | SM | 21.10.2020 | IE | 25.11.2020 | LU | 25.11.2020 | BE | 30.11.2020 | CH | 30.11.2020 | LI | 30.11.2020 | BG | 21.01.2021 | IS | 21.02.2021 | PT | 22.02.2021 | DE | 01.06.2021 | [2022/34] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 25.11.2015 | |
AL | 21.10.2020 | ||
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CY | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
MK | 21.10.2020 | ||
MT | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 25.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
DE | 01.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/28] | HU | 25.11.2015 | |
AL | 21.10.2020 | ||
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CY | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
MT | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 25.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
DE | 01.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 25.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
DE | 01.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 25.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
DE | 01.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 25.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
DE | 01.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
IE | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 25.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 25.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 25.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 21.10.2020 | |
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 21.10.2020 | |
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 21.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9600199 (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO]); | [A]WO9719030 (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO], et al); | [A]US5984994 (HUDSON ALICE P [US]); | [A]WO0060012 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [YD]WO0138263 (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO], et al); | [Y]WO02090295 (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO], et al) | by applicant | EP0320987 | EP0768993 | WO0138263 | EP1390322 |