EP3149174 - TARGETING DIMERIZATION OF BAX TO MODULATE BAX ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Albert Einstein College of Medicine, Inc. 1300 Morris Park Avenue Bronx, NY 10461 / US | [2017/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAVATHIOTIS, Evripidis 14009 Oak Avenue Flushing, NY 11355 / US | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | Paemen, Liesbet R.J., et al De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10 a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2017/14] | Application number, filing date | 15799253.8 | 28.05.2015 | [2017/14] | WO2015US32897 | Priority number, date | US201462005013P | 30.05.2014 Original published format: US 201462005013 P | [2017/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015184100 | Date: | 03.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3149174 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/82, C07K14/47 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
G01N33/68 (EP,US);
C07K14/001 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/00 (EP,US);
C07K14/474 (EP,US);
C07K7/06 (US);
C07K7/08 (US);
G01N33/502 (US);
G01N33/574 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
G01N2333/4703 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/14] | Extension states | BA | 30.12.2016 | ME | 30.12.2016 | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TARGETING-DIMERISIERUNG VON BAX ZUR MODULIERUNG DER BAX-AKTIVITÄT | [2017/14] | English: | TARGETING DIMERIZATION OF BAX TO MODULATE BAX ACTIVITY | [2017/14] | French: | CIBLAGE DE LA DIMÉRISATION DE BAX POUR MODULER L'ACTIVITÉ DE BAX | [2017/14] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 30.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/14] | 30.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2003096367 (KORSMEYER STANLEY J [US]) [X] 1, 2, 5/1, 5/2, 6-8 * ; paragraphs [0028]-[0031], [0035], [0156]; SEQ ID NO:3 * [Y] 3, 4, 5/3, 5/4; | [Y]US2010286057 (WALENSKY LOREN D [US], et al) [Y] 3, 4, 5/3, 5/4* ; Claims 1, 141 * |