EP3150695 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MAGNETIC BEAD METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degree Of Freedom Scientific Machine Co., Ltd. F/4 Tower A Room 419 No.18 Xihuan South Road Economic-Technological Development Area Daxing District Beijing 100176 / CN | [2017/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Xinzhi Room 419 F/4 Tower A No.18 Xihuan South Road Economic-Technological Development Area, Daxing District Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
ZHAO, Haifeng Room 419 F/4 Tower A No.18 Xihuan South Road Economic-Technological Development Area, Daxing District Beijing 100176 / CN | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | Guella, Paolo Brevetti Dott. Ing. Digiovanni Schmiedt S.r.l. Via Aldrovandi, 7 20129 Milano / IT | [2017/14] | Application number, filing date | 15799435.1 | 08.05.2015 | [2017/14] | WO2015CN78627 | Priority number, date | CN201410229179 | 27.05.2014 Original published format: CN201410229179 | [2017/14] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015180561 | Date: | 03.12.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3150695 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/42, C12M1/32 | [2018/03] | CPC: |
C12M47/10 (EP,US);
G01N1/4077 (US);
C12N15/1013 (US);
G01N1/10 (US);
G01N1/405 (US);
B03C1/01 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/14] | C12M1/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/14] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR MAGNETKÜGELCHENVERFAHREN | [2017/14] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MAGNETIC BEAD METHOD | [2017/14] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE BILLES MAGNÉTIQUES | [2017/14] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2016 | Translation filed | 07.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/14] | 07.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/02] | 27.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9418565 (LABSYSTEMS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,3,4,8,10,11,15 * page 4, paragraph 5 - page 6, line 29; figures 1,2a,2b *; | [X]EP0788602 (LABSYSTEMS OY [FI]) [X] 1,3,4,8,10,11,15 * [0004]-[0012],[0025];; figures 1-4 *; | [A]CN102690786 (WUHAN GELAN LIFU TECHNOLOGY CO LTD)[A] 1-15 | International search | [X]WO2007011305 (ATTOGENIX BIOSYSTEMS PTE LTD [SG], et al) [X] 1-17 * , see description, paragraphs 61-72, and figures 12-15 *; | [A]CN202011883U (RILAND STANFORD JUNIOR COLLEGE COUNCIL) [A] 1-17 * , see the whole document *; | [PX]CN104059848 (GUANGZHOU GUANKE BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [PX] 1-17* , see the whole document *; | [PX]CN203923174U (GUANGZHOU GUANKE BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [PX] 1-17 * , see the whole document *; | [PX]CN203960220U (BEIJING ZIYOUDU SCIENCE MACHINERY CO LTD) [PX] 1-17 * , see the whole document * |