EP3150600 - DIHYDROPYRIMIDO LOOP DERIVATIVE AS HBV INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qilu Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. No. 243, North Gongye Road Jinan Shandong 250100 / CN | [2018/16] |
Former [2017/44] | For all designated states Qilu Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd No. 243 North Gongye Road Jinan, Shandong 250100 / CN | ||
Former [2017/14] | For all designated states Medshine Discovery Inc. Room 218 No.9 Gaoxin Road Gaoxin Development District Nanjing, Jiangsu 272004 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HE, Haiying 288 Futezhong Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 02 /
ZHOU, Kai 288 Futezhong Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 03 /
QIN, Hua 288 Futezhong Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 04 /
LI, Xiaolin 288 Futezhong Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 05 /
ZHOU, Yuedong 288 Futezhong Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 06 /
WANG, Xiaofei 288 Futezhong Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 07 /
CHI, Xuemei 288 Futezhong Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 08 /
LI, Jian 288 Futezhong Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 09 /
CHEN, Shuhui 288 Futezhong Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2017/14] | Application number, filing date | 15799888.1 | 27.05.2015 | [2017/14] | WO2015CN79870 | Priority number, date | CN201410240665 | 30.05.2014 Original published format: CN201410240665 | CN201410850212 | 31.12.2014 Original published format: CN201410850212 | CN201510268946 | 22.05.2015 Original published format: CN201510268946 | [2017/14] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015180631 | Date: | 03.12.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3150600 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3150600 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/519, A61P31/20, C07D487/04, C07D498/04, C07D487/10, A61K31/527, A61K31/5377, A61P1/16 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
C07D513/04 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/527 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP,RU);
C07D471/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIHYDROPYRIMIDO-SCHLEIFENDERIVATE ALS HBV-INHIBITOR | [2017/14] | English: | DIHYDROPYRIMIDO LOOP DERIVATIVE AS HBV INHIBITOR | [2017/14] | French: | DÉRIVÉ DE BOUCLE DIHYDROPYRIMIDO À TITRE D'INHIBITEUR DU VHB | [2017/14] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2016 | Translation filed | 27.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 27.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/14] | 27.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2015 | AT | 27.06.2018 | CY | 27.06.2018 | CZ | 27.06.2018 | DK | 27.06.2018 | EE | 27.06.2018 | FI | 27.06.2018 | HR | 27.06.2018 | LT | 27.06.2018 | LV | 27.06.2018 | MC | 27.06.2018 | MK | 27.06.2018 | MT | 27.06.2018 | NL | 27.06.2018 | PL | 27.06.2018 | RS | 27.06.2018 | SE | 27.06.2018 | SI | 27.06.2018 | SK | 27.06.2018 | SM | 27.06.2018 | BG | 27.09.2018 | NO | 27.09.2018 | GR | 28.09.2018 | IS | 27.10.2018 | PT | 29.10.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 27.05.2015 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CY | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
MT | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 27.05.2015 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CY | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CY | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0145712 (BAYER AG [DE], et al); | [A]CN1305471 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]CN103570626 (SHANGHAI YIZHI MEDICAL TECH CO); | [A]CN103626752 (GUANGDONG HEC PHARMACEUTICAL); | [A]CN103664897 (GUANGDONG HEC PHARMACEUTICAL); | [A]CN103664899 (GUANGDONG HEC PHARMACEUTICAL); | [A]CN103664925 (GUANGDONG HEC PHARMACEUTICAL) |