EP3149371 - VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ST-Koneistus Oy Hopeatie 3 33470 Ylöjärvi / FI | [2019/25] |
Former [2017/14] | For all designated states Kratos OY Purukatu 7 70800 Kuopio / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNTTILA, Mikko c/o Kratos OY Purukatu 7 FI-70800 Kuopio / FI | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2017/14] | Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 15800044.8 | 22.05.2015 | [2017/14] | WO2015FI50355 | Priority number, date | FI20140005473 | 26.05.2014 Original published format: FI 20145473 | [2017/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015181444 | Date: | 03.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3149371 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 03.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/12, F16K15/02, F16K11/02, F16K11/10, F16K17/26, F15B13/02, F16K17/04, F16K17/196, F16K15/04 | [2018/02] | CPC: |
F16K17/196 (EP);
F16K15/02 (FI);
F15B13/028 (EP);
F16K11/02 (FI);
F16K11/105 (EP);
F16K15/025 (EP);
F16K15/044 (EP);
F16K17/0406 (EP);
F16K17/046 (EP);
F16K17/26 (EP);
F16K31/12 (FI);
F15B2211/3052 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2017/14] | F16K31/12, F16K15/02, F16K11/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/14] | Title | German: | VENTIL | [2017/14] | English: | VALVE | [2017/14] | French: | VANNE | [2017/14] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/14] | 05.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 05.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/45] | 02.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.08.2017 | 31.05.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6655405 (HOLLISTER F HAROLD [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9 * abstract *; | [X]US2335814 (ROBERT STEVENSON) [X] 1-6,8,9 * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2010163120 (ERICKSON DEAN M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9 * abstract *; | [X]FR711672 (M.TURGOT) [X] 1-6,8,9 * figures 7,8 *; | [A]US4013088 (GOCKE EBERHARD, et al) [A] 1-6,8,9 * abstract *; | [A]CN201795097U (NANJING AEROSUN MORITA ENVIRONMENTAL PROT S & T CO LTD) [A] 1-6,8,9 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2010263738 (TAYLOR JULIAN S [US]) [A] 1-6,8,9 * figure 3 *; | [A]EP1801298 (HONEYWELL TECHNOLOGIES SARL ECC [CH]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2006114074 (LUK FAHRZEUG HYDRAULIK [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | International search | [X]US6655405 (HOLLISTER F HAROLD [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 8, 9 * the whole document, in particular column 6, line 48 - column 7, line 65; column 9, lines 64-65; fig. 4, 5, 7-9 *; | [A]US5439022 (SUMMERS DANIEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US8397742 (THRASH THOMAS BENJAMIN [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * |