EP3150737 - HEAT-TREATED STEEL MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2019/27] |
Former [2017/14] | For all designated states Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TABATA, Shinichiro c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 02 /
HIKIDA, Kazuo c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 03 /
KOJIMA, Nobusato c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2017/14] | Application number, filing date | 15800264.2 | 26.05.2015 | [2017/14] | WO2015JP65067 | Priority number, date | JP20140111456 | 29.05.2014 Original published format: JP 2014111456 | [2017/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015182596 | Date: | 03.12.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3150737 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3150737 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, C22C38/60, C21D8/02, C21D9/46, C22C38/02, C22C38/06, C22C38/20, C22C38/22, C22C38/24, C22C38/26, C22C38/28, C22C38/32, C22C38/38, C22C38/42, C22C38/44, C22C38/48, C22C38/50, C22C38/54, C22C38/58 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
C21D9/46 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/38 (EP,KR,US);
B21D22/20 (EP,KR,US);
C21D8/0205 (EP,US);
C21D9/00 (EP,US);
C22C38/00 (EP,US);
C22C38/001 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/20 (EP,US);
C22C38/22 (EP,US);
C22C38/24 (EP,US);
C22C38/26 (EP,US);
C22C38/28 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/32 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/42 (EP,US);
C22C38/44 (EP,US);
C22C38/48 (EP,US);
C22C38/50 (EP,US);
C22C38/54 (EP,US);
C22C38/58 (EP,US);
C22C38/60 (EP,KR,US);
C21D1/18 (EP,US);
C21D2211/008 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/14] | C22C38/00, B21D22/20, C21D9/00, C22C38/60, C21D1/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMEBEHANDELTES STAHLMATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2017/14] | English: | HEAT-TREATED STEEL MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2017/14] | French: | ACIER TRAITÉ THERMIQUEMENT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2017/14] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2016 | Translation filed | 29.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/14] | 01.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.05.2015 | AL | 04.09.2019 | AT | 04.09.2019 | CY | 04.09.2019 | CZ | 04.09.2019 | DK | 04.09.2019 | EE | 04.09.2019 | FI | 04.09.2019 | HR | 04.09.2019 | LT | 04.09.2019 | LV | 04.09.2019 | MC | 04.09.2019 | MK | 04.09.2019 | MT | 04.09.2019 | NL | 04.09.2019 | RS | 04.09.2019 | SI | 04.09.2019 | SK | 04.09.2019 | SM | 04.09.2019 | TR | 04.09.2019 | BG | 04.12.2019 | NO | 04.12.2019 | GR | 05.12.2019 | IS | 05.01.2020 | PT | 06.01.2020 | IE | 26.05.2020 | IT | 26.05.2020 | LU | 26.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | [2023/27] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 26.05.2015 | |
AL | 04.09.2019 | ||
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CY | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
MK | 04.09.2019 | ||
MT | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
TR | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IE | 26.05.2020 | ||
LU | 26.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 26.05.2015 | |
AL | 04.09.2019 | ||
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CY | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
MT | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
TR | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IE | 26.05.2020 | ||
LU | 26.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IE | 26.05.2020 | ||
LU | 26.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/12] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IE | 26.05.2020 | ||
IT | 26.05.2020 | ||
LU | 26.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IE | 26.05.2020 | ||
LU | 26.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
LU | 26.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 04.09.2019 | |
NO | 04.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP4513608B (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0041]; claim 42 * * claims 1-7 *; | [Y]CN102822375 (JFE STEEL CORP) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0087] *; | [A]US2013199676 (TOMOKIYO TOSHIMASA [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * claims 1-9 *; | [A]CA2879069 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * abstract ** claims 1-5 * | International search | [A]JP2005205477 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-5 * , examples (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2006152427 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [A] 1-5 * , examples (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2012053637 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-5* , examples & US 2013/199676 A1 & EP 2631307 A1 & CN 103261452 A & KR 10-2013-55020 A *; | [A]WO2014024825 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * , examples & EP 2883976 A1 & CN 104520464 A & KR 10-2015-29734 A *; | [A]WO2014034714 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * , examples & EP 2891727 A1 & CN 104583445 A * | Examination | WO2013133137 |