EP3149008 - CERTAIN PROTEIN KINASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Fochon Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd Room 512, Building A No. 1289 Yishan Road Shanghai 200233 / CN | For all designated states Fochon Pharmaceuticals, Ltd. No. 100, Xingguang Avenue Renhe Town Yubei District Chongqing / CN | [2019/03] |
Former [2018/30] | For all designated states Shanghai Fochon Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd Room 512, Building A No. 1289 Yishan Road Shanghai 200233 / CN | ||
For all designated states Chongqing Fochon Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd 565 Tushan Road Nanan District Chongqing 400061 / CN | |||
Former [2017/14] | For all designated states Shanghai Fochon Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd Room 512, Building A No. 1289 Yishan Road Shanghai 200233 / CN | ||
For all designated states Chongqing Fochon Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 565 Tushan Road Nanan District Chongqing 400061 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Weibo 62 Sanders Ranch Road Moraga, California 94556 / US | 02 /
ZHAO, Xingdong 565 Tushan Road Nan'an District Chongquing 400061 / CN | 03 /
LI, Tongshuang 19232 69 Avenue Surrey, BC V4N 0B7 / CA | 04 /
TIAN, Qiang No. 565 Tushan Road Chongqing 400061 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Huajie No. 565 Tushan Road Chongqing 400061 / CN | 06 /
TAN, Haohan No. 565 Tushan Road Chongqing 400061 / CN | 07 /
WANG, Xianlong No. 565 Tushan Road Chongqing 400061 / CN | 08 /
LIU, Qihong No. 565 Tushan Road Chongqing 400061 / CN | 09 /
LI, Zhifu No. 565 Tushan Road Chongqing 400061 / CN | 10 /
ZHANG, Weipeng No. 565 Tushan Road Chongqing 400061 / CN | 11 /
CHEN, Zhifang No. 565 Tushan Road Chongqing 400061 / CN | 12 /
JIANG, Lihua No. 565 Tushan Road Chongqing 400061 / CN | 13 /
LIU, Yanxin No. 565 Tushan Road Chongqing 400061 / CN | 14 /
LINGHU, Li No. 565 Tushan Road Chongqing 400061 / CN | 15 /
LIN, Min No. 565 Tushan Road Chongqing 400061 / CN | 16 /
SUN, Jing No. 565 Tushan Road Chongqing 400061 / CN | [2017/27] |
Former [2017/14] | 01 /
WANG, Weibo 62 Sanders Ranch Road Moraga, California 94556 / US | ||
02 /
ZHAO, Xingdong Unit 6 2133 Donald Drive Moraga, California 94556 / US | |||
03 /
LI, Tongshuang 19232 69 Avenue Surrey, BC V4N 0B7 / CA | |||
04 /
TIAN, Qiang No. 565 Tushan Road Chongqing 400061 / CN | |||
05 /
ZHANG, Huajie No. 565 Tushan Road Chongqing 400061 / CN | |||
06 /
TAN, Haohan No. 565 Tushan Road Chongqing 400061 / CN | |||
07 /
WANG, Xianlong No. 565 Tushan Road Chongqing 400061 / CN | |||
08 /
LIU, Qihong No. 565 Tushan Road Chongqing 400061 / CN | |||
09 /
LI, Zhifu No. 565 Tushan Road Chongqing 400061 / CN | |||
10 /
ZHANG, Weipeng No. 565 Tushan Road Chongqing 400061 / CN | |||
11 /
CHEN, Zhifang No. 565 Tushan Road Chongqing 400061 / CN | |||
12 /
JIANG, Lihua No. 565 Tushan Road Chongqing 400061 / CN | |||
13 /
LIU, Yanxin No. 565 Tushan Road Chongqing 400061 / CN | |||
14 /
LINGHU, Li No. 565 Tushan Road Chongqing 400061 / CN | |||
15 /
LIN, Min No. 565 Tushan Road Chongqing 400061 / CN | |||
16 /
SUN, Jing No. 565 Tushan Road Chongqing 400061 / CN | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/14] | Brown, David Leslie Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15800531.4 | 27.05.2015 | [2017/14] | WO2015CN79910 | Priority number, date | US201462003626P | 28.05.2014 Original published format: US 201462003626 P | [2017/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015180642 | Date: | 03.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3149008 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3149008 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3149008 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07D519/00, A61K31/519, A61K31/53, A61P35/00 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
C07D519/00 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C07D495/04 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/53 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,RU);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/14 (EP,US);
C07D491/04 (RU);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/53, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESTIMMTE PROTEINKINASEHEMMER | [2017/14] | English: | CERTAIN PROTEIN KINASE INHIBITORS | [2017/14] | French: | INHIBITEURS PARTICULIERS DE PROTÉINES KINASES | [2017/14] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/14] | 14.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2015 | AL | 12.12.2018 | AT | 12.12.2018 | CY | 12.12.2018 | CZ | 12.12.2018 | EE | 12.12.2018 | FI | 12.12.2018 | HR | 12.12.2018 | LT | 12.12.2018 | LV | 12.12.2018 | MC | 12.12.2018 | MK | 12.12.2018 | MT | 12.12.2018 | NL | 12.12.2018 | PL | 12.12.2018 | RO | 12.12.2018 | RS | 12.12.2018 | SE | 12.12.2018 | SI | 12.12.2018 | SK | 12.12.2018 | SM | 12.12.2018 | TR | 12.12.2018 | BG | 12.03.2019 | NO | 12.03.2019 | GR | 13.03.2019 | IS | 12.04.2019 | PT | 12.04.2019 | IE | 27.05.2019 | LU | 27.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 27.05.2015 | |
AL | 12.12.2018 | ||
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CY | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
MT | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
IE | 27.05.2019 | ||
LU | 27.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 27.05.2015 | |
AL | 12.12.2018 | ||
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CY | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
IE | 27.05.2019 | ||
LU | 27.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CY | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
IE | 27.05.2019 | ||
LU | 27.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
IE | 27.05.2019 | ||
LU | 27.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
IE | 27.05.2019 | ||
LU | 27.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
LU | 27.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
LU | 27.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 12.12.2018 | |
NO | 12.03.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2005121107 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al); | [A]WO2009062258 (CYTOPIA RES PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [A]WO2011101409 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [A]WO2013150036 (SANOFI SA [FR]) |