01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
31.07.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
24.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
17.07.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
01.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
10.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.05.2020 [2020/20] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
09.08.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
06.08.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
06.08.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.08.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
21.05.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.04.2019 |
Change - English title |
published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] |
05.04.2019 |
Change - French title |
published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] |
21.11.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.02.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
09.02.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
24.11.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.10.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.07.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
16.06.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] |
16.06.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
16.06.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] |
26.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.04.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.06.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.06.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.12.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|