EP3223967 - WASTE SORTING DEVICE HAVING AN IMPROVED ROTARY SCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GREEN CREATIVE 9 bis avenue du Bouton d'or 94370 Sucy en Brie / FR | [2017/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOMEZ, Rémi 41 rue de la Quintinie F-75015 Paris / FR | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | Lavialle, Bruno François Stéphane, et al Cabinet Boettcher 5 rue de Vienne 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/40] | Lavialle, Bruno François Stéphane, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 15800818.5 | 24.11.2015 | [2017/40] | WO2015EP77574 | Priority number, date | FR20140061382 | 24.11.2014 Original published format: FR 1461382 | [2017/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016083423 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3223967 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3223967 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B07B1/24, B07B1/52, B65B55/24 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
B07B1/24 (EP,US);
B07B1/524 (EP,US);
B07B13/003 (US);
B65B55/24 (US);
B07B13/075 (US)
|
Former IPC [2017/40] | B07B1/24, B65B69/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABFALLSORTIERVORRICHTUNG MIT VERBESSERTEM DREHSIEB | [2017/40] | English: | WASTE SORTING DEVICE HAVING AN IMPROVED ROTARY SCREEN | [2017/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRI DE DÉCHETS À CRIBLE ROTATIF AMÉLIORÉ | [2017/40] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 29.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.11.2015 | AL | 10.07.2019 | AT | 10.07.2019 | CY | 10.07.2019 | CZ | 10.07.2019 | DK | 10.07.2019 | EE | 10.07.2019 | ES | 10.07.2019 | FI | 10.07.2019 | HR | 10.07.2019 | LT | 10.07.2019 | LV | 10.07.2019 | MC | 10.07.2019 | MK | 10.07.2019 | MT | 10.07.2019 | PL | 10.07.2019 | RO | 10.07.2019 | RS | 10.07.2019 | SE | 10.07.2019 | SI | 10.07.2019 | SK | 10.07.2019 | SM | 10.07.2019 | TR | 10.07.2019 | BG | 10.10.2019 | NO | 10.10.2019 | GR | 11.10.2019 | IS | 10.11.2019 | PT | 11.11.2019 | IE | 24.11.2019 | LU | 24.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 24.11.2015 | |
AL | 10.07.2019 | ||
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CY | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
MT | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IE | 24.11.2019 | ||
LU | 24.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 24.11.2015 | |
AL | 10.07.2019 | ||
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CY | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IE | 24.11.2019 | ||
LU | 24.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CY | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IE | 24.11.2019 | ||
LU | 24.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IE | 24.11.2019 | ||
LU | 24.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IE | 24.11.2019 | ||
LU | 24.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
LU | 24.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
LU | 24.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
LU | 24.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 10.07.2019 | |
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 10.07.2019 | |
NO | 10.10.2019 | Cited in | International search | [YA]FR2149927 (ALPINA KAESE AG) [Y] 1-3,10-14 * figure 3 * * page 3, line 5 - page 4, line 27 *[A] 4-9; | [YDA]WO2014076285 (ARTS [FR]) [YD] 1-3,10-14 * abstract * * claim - * * page 1, line 26 - page 6, line 9 * [A] 4-9 |