EP3079568 - DEVICE, METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR COUNTING THE NUMBER OF CYCLES OF A PERIODIC MOVEMENT OF A SUBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUIJERS, Erik Gosuinus Petrus c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
RUIJS, Louisa Simone c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
SARTOR, Francesco c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
LEMMENS, Paul Marcel Carl c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/42] | Representative(s) | Kruk, Arno Jan Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/42] | Kruk, Arno Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 15801846.5 | 30.11.2015 | [2016/42] | WO2015EP78038 | Priority number, date | EP20140195989 | 03.12.2014 Original published format: EP 14195989 | [2016/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016087358 | Date: | 09.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3079568 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3079568 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/11, G01C22/00 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
G01C22/006 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/00 (RU);
A61B5/1118 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/1123 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/7264 (EP,CN,US);
G01P13/00 (US);
G01P15/08 (RU);
G01P15/18 (US);
A61B2560/0209 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM ZÄHLEN DER ANZAHL VON ZYKLEN EINER PERIODISCHEN BEWEGUNG EINES GEGENSTANDES | [2017/01] | English: | DEVICE, METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR COUNTING THE NUMBER OF CYCLES OF A PERIODIC MOVEMENT OF A SUBJECT | [2016/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF, PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME PERMETTANT DE COMPTER LE NOMBRE DE CYCLES D'UN MOUVEMENT PÉRIODIQUE D'UN SUJET | [2017/01] |
Former [2016/42] | VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM ZÄHLEN DER ANZAHL VON ZYKLEN EINER PERIODISCHEN BEWEGUNG EINES SUBJEKTS | ||
Former [2016/42] | DISPOSITIF, PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR COMPTER LE NOMBRE DE CYCLES D'UN MOUVEMENT PÉRIODIQUE D'UN SUJET | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/42] | 03.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.11.2015 | AL | 21.06.2017 | AT | 21.06.2017 | CY | 21.06.2017 | CZ | 21.06.2017 | DK | 21.06.2017 | EE | 21.06.2017 | ES | 21.06.2017 | FI | 21.06.2017 | HR | 21.06.2017 | IT | 21.06.2017 | LT | 21.06.2017 | LV | 21.06.2017 | MC | 21.06.2017 | MK | 21.06.2017 | NL | 21.06.2017 | PL | 21.06.2017 | PT | 21.06.2017 | RO | 21.06.2017 | RS | 21.06.2017 | SE | 21.06.2017 | SI | 21.06.2017 | SK | 21.06.2017 | SM | 21.06.2017 | TR | 21.06.2017 | BG | 21.09.2017 | NO | 21.09.2017 | GR | 22.09.2017 | IS | 21.10.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | IE | 30.11.2017 | LU | 30.11.2017 | MT | 30.11.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 30.11.2015 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
MK | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PT | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
TR | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
IE | 30.11.2017 | ||
LU | 30.11.2017 | ||
MT | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 30.11.2015 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
MK | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
TR | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
IE | 30.11.2017 | ||
LU | 30.11.2017 | ||
MT | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 30.11.2015 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
MK | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
IE | 30.11.2017 | ||
LU | 30.11.2017 | ||
MT | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 30.11.2015 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
IE | 30.11.2017 | ||
LU | 30.11.2017 | ||
MT | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/37] | HU | 30.11.2015 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
IE | 30.11.2017 | ||
LU | 30.11.2017 | ||
MT | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 30.11.2015 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
IE | 30.11.2017 | ||
LU | 30.11.2017 | ||
MT | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
IE | 30.11.2017 | ||
LU | 30.11.2017 | ||
MT | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 30.11.2017 | ||
LU | 30.11.2017 | ||
MT | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
LU | 30.11.2017 | ||
MT | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
LU | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 21.06.2017 | |
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006174685 (SKVORTSOV VLADIMIR [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0037] - [0039] - [0045] - [0051] *; | [A]US7334472 (SEO JEONG-WOOK [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 11, line 49 - column 12, line 61 *; | [A]US2013190903 (BALAKRISHNAN SANTOSH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0059] - [0063] * | by applicant | US2006123905 | US2006174685 | US7334472 | - L. BAO; S. INTILLE, "Activity recognition from user-annotated acceleration data", PERVASIVE COMPUTING, (1999), vol. 3001, pages 1 - 17, XP019004314 | - FOERSTER F; SMEJA M; FAHRENBERG J., "Detection of posture and motion by accelerometry: a validation study in ambulatory monitoring", COMPUTERS IN HUMAN BEHAVIOR, (1999), vol. 15, doi:doi:10.1016/S0747-5632(99)00037-0, pages 571 - 583, XP055224675 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0747-5632(99)00037-0 | - POBER DM; STAUDENMAYER J; RAPHAEL C; FREEDSON PS, "Development of novel techniques to classify physical activity mode using accelerometers", MEDICINE AND SCIENCE IN SPORTS AND EXERCISE, (2006), vol. 38, doi:doi:10.1249/01.mss.0000227542.43669.45, pages 1626 - 1634, XP055059071 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1249/01.mss.0000227542.43669.45 |