EP3076873 - SYSTEM FOR GENERATING SPECTRAL COMPUTED TOMOGRAPHY PROJECTION DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/41] | EYI CHUSYSTEM FOR GENERATING SPECTRAL COMPUTED TOMOGRAPHY PROJECTION DATA | ||
[2016/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAERR, Heiner c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
STEADMAN BOOKER, Roger c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
VOGTMEIER, Gereon c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
ROESSL, Ewald c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
MARTENS, Gerhard c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
RIBBING, Carolina c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/41] | Representative(s) | Versteeg, Dennis John Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/41] | Application number, filing date | 15801865.5 | 01.12.2015 | [2016/41] | WO2015EP78113 | Priority number, date | EP20140196541 | 05.12.2014 Original published format: EP 14196541 | [2016/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016087394 | Date: | 09.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3076873 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3076873 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/03, A61B6/00, H05G1/00, A61B6/06 | [2016/41] | CPC: |
A61B6/032 (EP,CN,US);
A61B6/4085 (CN);
A61B6/06 (EP,US);
A61B6/4042 (EP,US);
A61B6/4078 (US);
A61B6/4233 (CN);
A61B6/4241 (EP,US);
A61B6/44 (CN);
A61B6/482 (EP,US);
A61B6/485 (EP,CN,US);
A61B6/52 (CN);
A61B6/582 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG SPEKTRALER PROJEKTIONSDATEN | [2016/43] | English: | SYSTEM FOR GENERATING SPECTRAL COMPUTED TOMOGRAPHY PROJECTION DATA | [2016/43] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GÉNÉRATION DE DONNÉES DE PROJECTION SPECTRALE | [2016/43] |
Former [2016/41] | RÖNTGENSYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG SPEKTRALER COMPUTERTOMOGRAFIE-PROJEKTIONSDATEN | ||
Former [2016/41] | EYI CHUSYSTEM FOR GENERATING SPECTRAL COMPUTED TOMOGRAPHY PROJECTION DATA | ||
Former [2016/41] | SYSTÈME EYI CHU POUR GÉNÉRER DES DONNÉES DE PROJECTION PAR TOMODENSITOMÉTRIE SPECTRALE | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/41] | 24.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.12.2015 | AL | 12.04.2017 | AT | 12.04.2017 | CY | 12.04.2017 | CZ | 12.04.2017 | DK | 12.04.2017 | EE | 12.04.2017 | ES | 12.04.2017 | FI | 12.04.2017 | HR | 12.04.2017 | IT | 12.04.2017 | LT | 12.04.2017 | LV | 12.04.2017 | MC | 12.04.2017 | MK | 12.04.2017 | NL | 12.04.2017 | PL | 12.04.2017 | PT | 12.04.2017 | RO | 12.04.2017 | RS | 12.04.2017 | SE | 12.04.2017 | SI | 12.04.2017 | SK | 12.04.2017 | SM | 12.04.2017 | TR | 12.04.2017 | BG | 12.07.2017 | NO | 12.07.2017 | GR | 13.07.2017 | IS | 12.08.2017 | IE | 01.12.2017 | LU | 01.12.2017 | MT | 01.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 01.12.2015 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MK | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 01.12.2017 | ||
LU | 01.12.2017 | ||
MT | 01.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 01.12.2015 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MK | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 01.12.2017 | ||
LU | 01.12.2017 | ||
MT | 01.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 01.12.2015 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MK | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 01.12.2017 | ||
LU | 01.12.2017 | ||
MT | 01.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 01.12.2015 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 01.12.2017 | ||
LU | 01.12.2017 | ||
MT | 01.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/41] | HU | 01.12.2015 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 01.12.2017 | ||
LU | 01.12.2017 | ||
MT | 01.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/37] | HU | 01.12.2015 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 01.12.2017 | ||
LU | 01.12.2017 | ||
MT | 01.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 01.12.2015 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 01.12.2017 | ||
LU | 01.12.2017 | ||
MT | 01.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 01.12.2017 | ||
LU | 01.12.2017 | ||
MT | 01.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 01.12.2017 | ||
LU | 01.12.2017 | ||
MT | 01.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 01.12.2017 | ||
LU | 01.12.2017 | ||
MT | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
LU | 01.12.2017 | ||
MT | 01.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 12.04.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4323784 (CONRAD BERNHARD) [A] 1-15* sentence 9, paragraph 5 - sentence 14; figure 1 *; | [A]US2007291898 (GROVES JOEL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2014072098 (KAPPLER STEFFEN [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0048]; figures 1-6 * | by applicant | US2014072098 | - J. P. SCHLOMKA ET AL., "Experimental feasibility of multi-energy photon-counting K-edge imaging in pre-clinical computed tomography", PHYSICS IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, (2008), vol. 53, pages 4031 - 4047, XP020141344 | - R. STEADMAN ET AL., "ChromAIX: Fast photon-counting ASIC for Spectral Computed Tomography", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS AND METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH SECTION A: ACCELERATORS, SPECTROMETERS, DETECTORS AND ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT, (2011), vol. 648, doi:doi:10.1016/j.nima.2010.11.149, pages S211 - S215, XP028245000 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nima.2010.11.149 |