EP3234751 - DATA PROCESSING APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR RENDERING A TREE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Madison Patent Holdings, SAS 3 Rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/13] | For all designated states InterDigital Madison Patent Holdings, SAS 3 rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2021/03] | For all designated states InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 3 rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2019/19] | For all designated states InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 3 rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2017/43] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROCKE, Jens Marktstrasse 18 30880 Laatzen / DE | 02 /
GLAESER, Frank Allerweg 4 30449 Hannover / DE | 03 /
KUBSCH, Stefan Im Ohr 2 31559 Hohnhorst / DE | 04 /
LI, Hui Schwarze Worth 40 30539 Hannover / DE | 05 /
PIEPER, Michael Gebrueder-Hartmann-Str. 19 30659 Hannover / DE | 06 /
WEBER, Michael Zikadenweg 9 30559 Hannover / DE | [2017/43] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/03] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2017/43] | Huchet, Anne TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 15802066.9 | 27.11.2015 | [2017/43] | WO2015EP77876 | Priority number, date | EP20140307100 | 19.12.2014 Original published format: EP 14307100 | [2017/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016096368 | Date: | 23.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3234751 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3234751 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0482 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
G06F3/0482 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
G06F16/2246 (EP,RU,US);
G06F3/04812 (KR);
G06F3/0487 (RU,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR DARSTELLUNG EINER BAUMSTRUKTUR | [2017/43] | English: | DATA PROCESSING APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR RENDERING A TREE STRUCTURE | [2017/43] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES POUR LE RENDU D'UNE STRUCTURE D'ARBORESCENCE | [2017/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 13.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.11.2015 | AL | 20.01.2021 | AT | 20.01.2021 | CY | 20.01.2021 | CZ | 20.01.2021 | DK | 20.01.2021 | EE | 20.01.2021 | ES | 20.01.2021 | FI | 20.01.2021 | HR | 20.01.2021 | IT | 20.01.2021 | LT | 20.01.2021 | LV | 20.01.2021 | MC | 20.01.2021 | MK | 20.01.2021 | MT | 20.01.2021 | PL | 20.01.2021 | RO | 20.01.2021 | RS | 20.01.2021 | SE | 20.01.2021 | SI | 20.01.2021 | SK | 20.01.2021 | SM | 20.01.2021 | TR | 20.01.2021 | BG | 20.04.2021 | NO | 20.04.2021 | GR | 21.04.2021 | IS | 20.05.2021 | PT | 20.05.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 27.11.2015 | |
AL | 20.01.2021 | ||
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CY | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
MK | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
TR | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 27.11.2015 | |
AL | 20.01.2021 | ||
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CY | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
MK | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 27.11.2015 | |
AL | 20.01.2021 | ||
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CY | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 27.11.2015 | |
AL | 20.01.2021 | ||
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6380957 (BANNING KENNETH RAY [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, lines 20-48 * * column 6, line 25 - column 7, line 27 * * claims 1,7,13 *; | [Y]US8001487 (KOPPERT ERIK [AU]) [Y] 1-15 * column 4, lines 10-18 * * column 7, line 29 - column 8, line 6 ** column 8, lines 47-67 * |