|
17.07.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.08.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2019 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.07.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
17.07.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
17.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.02.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2019 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2019 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2018 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2017 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2017 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.07.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
19.06.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
01.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
02.02.2016 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
05.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
14.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
14.12.2015 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
14.12.2015 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
07.12.2015 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
30.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
24 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |