EP3152194 - BENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/15] | BENZIMIDAZOLE ANALOGUES AND RELATED METHODS | ||
[2019/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arizona Board of Regents on Behalf of the University of Arizona 220 W. Sixth Street, 4th Floor Tucson, AZ 85701 / US | For all designated states Università degli Studi di Napoli Federico II Terzo Piano Torre Biologica (Edificio 19) Via S. Pansini 5 80131 Naples / IT | [2019/40] |
Former [2019/20] | For all designated states Arizona Board of Regents on Behalf of the University of Arizona 220 W. Sixth Street, 4th Floor Tucson, AZ 85701 / US | ||
For all designated states Universita Federico II Terzo Piano Torre Biologica (Edificio 19) Via S. Pansini 5 80131 Naples / IT | |||
Former [2017/15] | For all designated states Arizona Board of Regents on Behalf of the University of Arizona 220 W. Sixth Street, 4th Floor Tucson, AZ 85701 / US | ||
For all designated states Universita Federico II Terzo Piano Torre Biologica (Edificio 19) Via S. Pansini 5 80131 Naples / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Hong-yu 220 W. Sixth Street, 4th Floor Tucson, AZ 85701 / US | 02 /
FRETT, Brendan 220 W. Sixth Street, 4th Floor Tucson, AZ 85701 / US | 03 /
SANTORO, Massimo Terzo Piano, Torre Biologica (Edificio 19) Via S. Pansini 5 I-80131 Naples / IT | 04 /
CARLOMAGNO, Francesca Terzo Piano, Torre Biologica (Edificio 19) Via S. Pansini 5 I-80131 Naples / IT | [2017/15] | Representative(s) | Long, Giorgio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [2019/20] |
Former [2017/15] | Long, Giorgio Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 15802538.7 | 03.06.2015 | [2017/15] | WO2015US33962 | Priority number, date | US201462007321P | 03.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462007321 P | [2017/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015187818 | Date: | 10.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3152194 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3152194 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3152194 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07D235/06 | [2017/15] | CPC: |
C07D413/14 (EP,US);
A61K31/422 (EP,US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
C07D413/12 (EP,US);
C12N9/12 (EP,US);
C12Y207/10002 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BENZIMIDAZOLDERIVATE | [2019/01] | English: | BENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES | [2019/01] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE BENZIMIDAZOLE | [2019/01] |
Former [2017/15] | BENZIMIDAZOLANALOGA UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2017/15] | BENZIMIDAZOLE ANALOGUES AND RELATED METHODS | ||
Former [2017/15] | ANALOGUES DE BENZIMIDAZOLE ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/15] | 28.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 13.08.2019 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.06.2015 | AL | 15.05.2019 | AT | 15.05.2019 | CY | 15.05.2019 | CZ | 15.05.2019 | DK | 15.05.2019 | EE | 15.05.2019 | FI | 15.05.2019 | HR | 15.05.2019 | LT | 15.05.2019 | LV | 15.05.2019 | MC | 15.05.2019 | MK | 15.05.2019 | MT | 15.05.2019 | PL | 15.05.2019 | RO | 15.05.2019 | RS | 15.05.2019 | SE | 15.05.2019 | SI | 15.05.2019 | SK | 15.05.2019 | SM | 15.05.2019 | TR | 15.05.2019 | IE | 03.06.2019 | LU | 03.06.2019 | BG | 15.08.2019 | NO | 15.08.2019 | GR | 16.08.2019 | IS | 15.09.2019 | PT | 15.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 03.06.2015 | |
AL | 15.05.2019 | ||
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
MT | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.06.2019 | ||
LU | 03.06.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 03.06.2015 | |
AL | 15.05.2019 | ||
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.06.2019 | ||
LU | 03.06.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.06.2019 | ||
LU | 03.06.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.06.2019 | ||
LU | 03.06.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.06.2019 | ||
LU | 03.06.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.06.2019 | ||
LU | 03.06.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.06.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 15.05.2019 | |
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 15.05.2019 | |
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]EP1904494 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [A] 1, 33, 35-38, 40-46, 52 * ; paragraphs [0006], [0337] *; | [A]US2012135953 (MC GOWAN DAVID [BE], et al) [A] 4-31, 32/4-31, 50-51 * ; paragraphs [0083]-[0084], [0088] . *; | [A]US2012184561 (BOLD GUIDO [CH], et al) [A] 1, 33, 35-33, 40-46, 52 * ; paragraphs [0014]-[0035], [0541] *; | [A]US2014107172 (VANDYCK KOEN [BE], et al) [A] 21-31, 32/21-31, 50-51* ; paragraphs [0205]-[0207] *; | [A] - VOURLOUMIS, D et al., "Solid-phase synthesis of benzimidazole libraries biased for RNA targets", Tetrahedron Letters, vol. 44, no. 14, ISSN 0040-4039, (20030000), pages 2807 - 2811, URL: http://tch.ucsd.edu/pdfs/TetLett_44_2807_2003.pdf, (20150731), XP004414453 [A] 4-20, 32/4-20, 47-49 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(03)00453-2 |