EP3153973 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE AND METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2017/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KII Manabu c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
HOSODA Yasuhide c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2017/15] | Representative(s) | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB Amalienstraße 62 80799 München / DE | [2017/15] | Application number, filing date | 15803179.9 | 22.05.2015 | [2017/15] | WO2015JP64676 | Priority number, date | JP20140118201 | 06.06.2014 Original published format: JP 2014118201 | [2017/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015186534 | Date: | 10.12.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3153973 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10, // H04L12/58 | [2018/03] | CPC: |
H04L51/10 (EP,US);
H04L51/52 (EP,US);
G06F13/00 (EP,US);
G06F3/147 (US);
G06Q10/107 (EP,US);
G06T1/00 (EP,US);
H04L51/216 (EP,US);
H04M11/00 (EP,US);
G06F3/04817 (US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06V40/174 (US);
G09G2310/027 (EP);
G09G2340/0435 (EP);
H04M1/72427 (EP,US);
H04M1/72436 (EP,US);
H04M2250/60 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/15] | G06F13/00, G06T1/00, H04M1/00, H04M11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/15] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2017/15] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE AND METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2017/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, ET PROGRAMME | [2017/15] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2016 | Translation filed | 02.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/15] | 22.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.12.2020 | 02.12.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/18] | 27.12.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2001033298 (SLOTZNICK BENJAMIN [US]) [X] 1-3,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0032] - [0058] * [I] 4-13; | [A]US2002184309 (DANKER DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0069] - [0075] *; | [A]US7913176 (BLATTNER PATRICK D [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 17; figures 1-3 ** column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 51 *; | [XI]US2011141919 (SINGH AMIT [US], et al) [X] 1-3,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0014] - [0018] - [0023] - [0028] - [0058] - [0059] * [I] 4-13; | [A]US2012327183 (FUJII HIROMITSU [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0121] - [0127]; figures 8-12 * | International search | [Y]JP2001160021 (SONY CORP) [Y] 8 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0015] to [0019] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2002055920 (NAMCO LTD) [A] 1-20 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [XY]JP2002236656 (NIFTY CORP) [X] 1-7, 9-20 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0047]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) * [Y] 8; | [A]JP2006338685 (KONAMI DIGITAL ENTERTAINMENT) [A] 1-20* , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * |