08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
15.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
02.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
23.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
16.04.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
25.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
04.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
20.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
08.05.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
04.05.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
27.04.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.04.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
30.03.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.02.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
28.02.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
24.02.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.02.2020 |
First examination report |
|
12.02.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.11.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.02.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
16.02.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
19.01.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.11.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.09.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
15.09.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
15.09.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
25.08.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.08.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.08.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.07.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
11.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.06.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.06.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.12.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|