EP3227834 - STANDARD CARD READER FOR MOBILE APPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hirschmann Car Communication GmbH Stuttgarter Strasse 45-51 72654 Neckartenzlingen / DE | [2017/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GELMAN, Alexander Pestalozzistrasse 59 70736 Fellbach / DE | 02 /
SILVA, David Jettenhartstrasse 16/1 72622 Nürtingen / DE | [2017/41] | Representative(s) | Greif, Thomas Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [2017/41] | Application number, filing date | 15804443.8 | 02.12.2015 | [2017/41] | WO2015EP78358 | Priority number, date | DE201410224573 | 02.12.2014 Original published format: DE102014224573 | [2017/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016087513 | Date: | 09.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3227834 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06K13/08 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
G06K13/085 (EP,CN,US);
G06K7/006 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] | Title | German: | STANDARD-KARTENLESER FÜR MOBILE ANWENDUNG | [2017/41] | English: | STANDARD CARD READER FOR MOBILE APPLICATION | [2017/41] | French: | LECTEUR DE CARTE STANDARD POUR UTILISATION MOBILE | [2017/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 30.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/48] | 21.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/48] | Request for further processing for: | 07.05.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 07.05.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.05.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3518247 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-7* the whole document *; | [X]US2007057055 (HORNG DAR-SHAN [TW]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0036] * * figures 4-6 *; | [X]US2010085716 (LONG SHI-JIN [CN], et al) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2474387 (NIDEC SANKYO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042] * * figures 2-4 *; | [X]DE102014203876 (HIRSCHMANN CAR COMM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0024] * * figure - * |