EP3215406 - HYBRID VEHICLE CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/37] | ENGINE CONTROL SYSTEM | ||
[2018/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Systèmes de Contrôle Moteur 14 Avenue des Béguines 95800 Cergy Saint Christophe / FR | [2017/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARNAIZ, Lionel c/o Valeo Systèmes de Contrôle Moteur 14 avenue des Béguines 95800 Cergy Saint Christophe / FR | [2017/37] | Representative(s) | Garcia, Christine Propriété Intellectuelle Valeo Systèmes de Contrôle Moteur 14, avenue des Béguines 95800 Cergy St Christophe / FR | [2017/37] | Application number, filing date | 15804883.5 | 05.11.2015 | [2017/37] | WO2015FR52994 | Priority number, date | FR20140060789 | 07.11.2014 Original published format: FR 1460789 | [2017/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016071642 | Date: | 12.05.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3215406 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3215406 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60W10/26, B60W30/18, B60W20/12 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
B60W10/26 (EP,CN,US);
B60W30/18127 (EP,CN,US);
B60W20/11 (US);
B60W20/12 (EP,US);
B60W20/14 (US);
B60W2510/244 (US);
B60W2552/15 (EP,US);
B60W2552/20 (EP,CN,US);
B60W2556/50 (EP,CN,US);
Y10S903/93 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/37] | B60W10/26, B60W30/18, B60W20/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR HYBRIDFAHRZEUG | [2018/14] | English: | HYBRID VEHICLE CONTROL METHOD | [2018/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE DE VÉHICULE HYBRIDE | [2018/14] |
Former [2017/37] | MOTORSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2017/37] | ENGINE CONTROL SYSTEM | ||
Former [2017/37] | SYSTÈME DE CONTRÔLE MOTEUR | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/37] | 29.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.11.2015 | AL | 29.08.2018 | AT | 29.08.2018 | CY | 29.08.2018 | CZ | 29.08.2018 | DK | 29.08.2018 | EE | 29.08.2018 | ES | 29.08.2018 | FI | 29.08.2018 | HR | 29.08.2018 | LT | 29.08.2018 | LV | 29.08.2018 | MC | 29.08.2018 | MK | 29.08.2018 | MT | 29.08.2018 | NL | 29.08.2018 | PL | 29.08.2018 | PT | 29.08.2018 | RO | 29.08.2018 | RS | 29.08.2018 | SE | 29.08.2018 | SI | 29.08.2018 | SK | 29.08.2018 | SM | 29.08.2018 | TR | 29.08.2018 | IE | 05.11.2018 | LU | 05.11.2018 | BG | 29.11.2018 | NO | 29.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | FR | 30.11.2018 | GR | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | IS | 29.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
MT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PT | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IE | 05.11.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
MT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IE | 05.11.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
MT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
IE | 05.11.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
IE | 05.11.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
IE | 05.11.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
IE | 05.11.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 29.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2013167149 (VOLVO LASTVAGNAR AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-11 * claims 1,2,4,5,8 *; | [Y]DE102012013689 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0034] *; | [AD]WO2014058383 (SCANIA CV AB [SE]) [AD] 1-11* page 19, line 1 - page 20, line 7 * | by applicant | WO2014058383 |