Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3224883 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201580074490 CN202011411819 EP15805038 EP19193255 EP23158487 JP2017528177 JP2021100720 JP2023029469 JP2024226125 US2015061777W

More

US201514934297 US201916241277 US202217697050 US202217697061



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2022209289Global Dossier 30.06.2022A1
Priority number Date
US201514934297 06.11.2015
US201462084907 26.11.2014
US202217697061 17.03.2022
US201916241277 07.01.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2022209288Global Dossier 30.06.2022A1
Priority number Date
US201514934297 06.11.2015
US201462084907 26.11.2014
US202217697050 17.03.2022
US201916241277 07.01.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11309581Global Dossier 19.04.2022B2
US2019148770 16.05.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201514934297 06.11.2015
US201462084907 26.11.2014
US201916241277 07.01.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10211481Global Dossier 19.02.2019B2
US2016149260 26.05.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201514934297 06.11.2015
US201462084907 26.11.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2025038209Global Dossier 18.03.2025A
Priority number Date
JP2023029469 28.02.2023
JP2017528177 20.11.2015
JP2021100720 17.06.2021
US201462084907 26.11.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2023081903Global Dossier 13.06.2023A
Priority number Date
JP2017528177 20.11.2015
JP2021100720 17.06.2021
US201462084907 26.11.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP7621202BGlobal Dossier 24.01.2025B2
JP2021177485 11.11.2021A
Priority number Date
JP2017528177 20.11.2015
US201462084907 26.11.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2018502809Global Dossier 01.02.2018A
Priority number Date
US201462084907 26.11.2014
WO2015US61777 20.11.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4207376Global Dossier 20.12.2023A3
EP4207376 05.07.2023A2
Priority number Date
EP19193255 20.11.2015
EP15805038 20.11.2015
US201462084907 26.11.2014
WO2015US61777 20.11.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3595057Global Dossier 03.05.2023B1
EP3595057 15.01.2020A1
Priority number Date
EP15805038 20.11.2015
US201462084907 26.11.2014
WO2015US61777 20.11.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN112563566Global Dossier 26.03.2021A
Priority number Date
CN201580074490 20.11.2015
US201462084907 26.11.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN107408680BGlobal Dossier 24.11.2020B
CN107408680 28.11.2017A
Priority number Date
US201462084907 26.11.2014
WO2015US61777 20.11.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3224883Global Dossier 16.10.2019B1
EP3224883 04.10.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201462084907 26.11.2014
WO2015US61777 20.11.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2016085792Global Dossier 02.06.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201462084907 26.11.2014
TypeType Divisional application
 EP3595057