EP3212316 - ASSEMBLY OF A TINTOMETRIC MACHINE AND A TROLLEY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Drocco, Luca Strada Castelgherlone, 42 12051 Alba (CN) / IT | For all designated states Drocco, Mario Loc. San Cassiano 6/29 12051 Alba (CN) / IT | [2017/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/36] | Representative(s) | Boario, Enrico Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | [2022/32] |
Former [2017/36] | Boario, Enrico Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 20128 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 15805260.5 | 27.10.2015 | [2017/36] | WO2015IB58259 | Priority number, date | IT2014TO00877 | 28.10.2014 Original published format: IT TO20140877 | [2017/36] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016067186 | Date: | 06.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3212316 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3212316 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01F33/501, B01F33/841, B01F35/00, B01F35/21, // B01F101/30 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
B01F33/501 (EP,CN,US);
B01F33/841 (EP,CN,US);
B01F35/2112 (EP,CN,US);
B01F35/56 (EP,CN,US);
B01F2101/30 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/36] | B01F13/10, B01F13/00, B01F15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG EINER KOLORIMETRISCHEN MASCHINE UND EINES WAGENS | [2017/36] | English: | ASSEMBLY OF A TINTOMETRIC MACHINE AND A TROLLEY | [2017/36] | French: | ENSEMBLE MACHINE TINTOMÉTRIQUE ET CHARIOT | [2017/36] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/36] | 10.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   22.03.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.10.2015 | AL | 10.08.2022 | AT | 10.08.2022 | BG | 10.08.2022 | CY | 10.08.2022 | CZ | 10.08.2022 | DK | 10.08.2022 | EE | 10.08.2022 | FI | 10.08.2022 | HR | 10.08.2022 | IT | 10.08.2022 | LT | 10.08.2022 | LV | 10.08.2022 | MC | 10.08.2022 | MK | 10.08.2022 | MT | 10.08.2022 | PL | 10.08.2022 | RO | 10.08.2022 | RS | 10.08.2022 | SE | 10.08.2022 | SI | 10.08.2022 | SK | 10.08.2022 | SM | 10.08.2022 | TR | 10.08.2022 | IE | 27.10.2022 | LU | 27.10.2022 | BE | 31.10.2022 | CH | 31.10.2022 | LI | 31.10.2022 | NO | 10.11.2022 | GR | 11.11.2022 | IS | 10.12.2022 | PT | 12.12.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 27.10.2015 | |
AL | 10.08.2022 | ||
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
BG | 10.08.2022 | ||
CY | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
IT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
MK | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
TR | 10.08.2022 | ||
IE | 27.10.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/29] | HU | 27.10.2015 | |
AL | 10.08.2022 | ||
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CY | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
IT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
MK | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
TR | 10.08.2022 | ||
IE | 27.10.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 27.10.2015 | |
AL | 10.08.2022 | ||
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CY | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
IT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
MK | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
IE | 27.10.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 27.10.2015 | |
AL | 10.08.2022 | ||
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CY | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
IT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
IE | 27.10.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 27.10.2015 | |
AL | 10.08.2022 | ||
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CY | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
IE | 27.10.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 27.10.2015 | |
AL | 10.08.2022 | ||
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
IE | 27.10.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
IE | 27.10.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
LU | 27.10.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 10.08.2022 | |
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 10.08.2022 | |
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 10.08.2022 | |
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 10.08.2022 | |
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0176140 (MONTELERA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * page 7, line 18 - line 30 *; | [A]ES2169957 (IND QUIMICAS KUPSA S L [ES]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2006118581 (CLARK ROBERT A [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract ** figures 1,2 *; | [IY]WO2011061406 (XEMEC OY [FI], et al) [I] 1-7 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] , [0018] - [0026] * [Y] 8; | [A]US2013199663 (NEWBOLD DAVID DIXON [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0032] , [0033] *; | [YA]US8564778 (IGARASHI LARRY Y [US]) [Y] 8 * figures 1A-2 * * abstract * * column 7, line 10 - line 38 * [A] 1-7 |