EP3220806 - ATHLETIC BAND WITH REMOVABLE MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKE Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005 / US | [2017/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COBBETT, Jamian R. c/o NIKE, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | 02 /
JUDGE, Monica c/o NIKE, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | 03 /
SCHNEIDER, Summer c/o NIKE, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | 04 /
MANESH, Ariana c/o Terrazign, Inc. 939 SE Adler St. Unit 11 Portland, Oregon 97214 / US | 05 /
QUAY, Simon c/o Terrazign, Inc. 939 SE Adler St. Unit 11 Portland, Oregon 97214 / US | 06 /
WEBB, Bill c/o Huge Design, LLC 1426 18th Street San Francisco, California 94110 / US | 07 /
FITZGERALD, Quinn c/o Huge Design, LLC 1426 18th Street San Francisco, California 94110 / US | 08 /
WATT, Russ c/o NIKE, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | [2017/39] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/39] | McCartney, Jonathan William Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15805361.1 | 19.11.2015 | [2017/39] | WO2015US61691 | Priority number, date | US201462082113P | 19.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462082113 P | US201562100782P | 07.01.2015 Original published format: US 201562100782 P | US201562146029P | 10.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562146029 P | US201562168357P | 29.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562168357 P | US201562168502P | 29.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562168502 P | US201562215497P | 08.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562215497 P | [2017/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016081776 | Date: | 26.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3220806 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2017/39] | CPC: |
G16H20/30 (EP,US);
A61B5/6802 (KR);
A41D27/205 (EP,CN,US);
A41D1/002 (US);
A41D1/005 (CN,US);
A41D20/00 (CN,US);
A41H43/04 (EP,CN,US);
A45F5/00 (CN,US);
A61B5/0004 (KR);
A61B5/002 (US);
A61B5/0022 (US);
A61B5/0024 (US);
A61B5/0205 (US);
A61B5/02416 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/02438 (US);
A61B5/1118 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B5/4866 (US);
A61B5/6804 (US);
A61B5/6807 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/681 (US);
A61B5/6824 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/6831 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B5/7207 (US);
A61B5/7221 (US);
A61B5/7278 (US);
A61B5/742 (US);
A61B5/7455 (EP,US);
A61B5/7475 (KR);
A63B24/0062 (CN,US);
B29C65/02 (US);
B29C65/52 (US);
B29C65/7832 (US);
B29C66/4324 (US);
B29C66/71 (US);
B29C66/729 (US);
G01C21/3697 (US);
G06F1/163 (CN,US);
G06F3/016 (CN,US);
G06F3/0227 (CN,US);
G08B6/00 (US);
G16H20/40 (US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
G16Z99/00 (EP,CN,US);
A41D2300/52 (EP,CN,US);
A45F2005/008 (EP,CN,US);
A45F2200/05 (US);
A61B2503/10 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2560/0223 (US);
A61B2560/0443 (KR);
A61B2562/0219 (US);
B29K2623/06 (US);
B29K2913/00 (US);
B29K2995/0046 (US);
B29L2029/00 (US);
B29L2031/48 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] | Title | German: | SPORTBAND MIT ABNEHMBAREM MODUL | [2017/39] | English: | ATHLETIC BAND WITH REMOVABLE MODULE | [2017/39] | French: | BANDE POUR ACTIVITÉ PHYSIQUE À MODULE AMOVIBLE | [2017/39] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/39] | 30.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/42] | 30.10.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2014037874 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]US2014176944 (ADDISON PAUL STANLEY [GB], et al) |