EP3154480 - BIODEGRADABLE WIRE WITH CENTRAL FILAMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2019 [2019/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fort Wayne Metals Research Products Corporation 9609 Ardmore Avenue P.O. Box 9040 Fort Wayne, IN 46899 / US | [2017/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAFFER, Jeremy, E. 13034 Cherry Street Leo, IN 46765 / US | 02 /
GRIEBEL, Adam, J. 7415 Maples Road Fort Wayne, IN 46816 / US | [2017/16] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2017/16] | Application number, filing date | 15806272.9 | 12.06.2015 | [2017/16] | WO2015US35583 | Priority number, date | US201462011703P | 13.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462011703 P | US201562136023P | 20.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562136023 P | [2017/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015192019 | Date: | 17.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3154480 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/02, A61L31/10, A61L31/14, A61F2/01, A61B17/06, A61B17/064, A61F2/86, A61L17/12 | [2018/03] | CPC: |
A61L31/10 (EP,US);
A61B17/06166 (US);
A61F2/01 (EP,US);
A61F2/86 (EP,US);
A61L17/12 (EP,US);
A61L31/022 (EP,US);
A61L31/148 (EP,US);
A61B17/064 (US);
A61B2017/00004 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61L31/10, C08L67/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/16] | A61F2/82, A61L31/00, B23P11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/16] | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARE DRAHT MIT ZENTRALEM FILAMENT | [2017/16] | English: | BIODEGRADABLE WIRE WITH CENTRAL FILAMENT | [2017/16] | French: | FIL BIODÉGRADABLE AVEC FILAMENT CENTRAL | [2017/16] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/16] | 23.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/43] | 18.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0668083 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,11,12 * page 3, lines 16-30 * * claim - *; | [XI]US2013261735 (PACETTI STEPHEN D [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,11,12 * page 3, paragraph 45 - page 4, paragraph 55 * * claim - * [I] 7,9,10,13-15; | [XD]WO2014011803 (FORT WAYNE METALS RES PROD [US], et al) [XD] 1,2,4-6,8,11,12 * page 3, paragraph 11 - page 4, paragraph 13 * * page 14, paragraph 30 - page 15, paragraph 36 * * page 24, paragraph 65 * * page 22, paragraph 56 ** claim - * | International search | [A]US2003153972 (HELMUS MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2011313271 (SCHULMAN JOSEPH H [US]) [A] 1 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2011319978 (SCHAFFER JEREMY E [US]) [A] 1-3 * ; paragraphs [0012, 0016, 0050, 0076, 0074, 0102-0107] *; | [A]US2014107399 (SPENCE PAUL A [US]) [A] 1* ; entire document * |