EP3155098 - FACTOR VIII MUTATION REPAIR AND TOLERANCE INDUCTION AND RELATED CDNAs, COMPOSITIONS, METHODS AND SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2018 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Howard, Tom E. 2703 Ruhland Avenue Apt. 3 Redondo Beach, California 90278 / US | [2017/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/16] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/16] | Thom, Russell Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 15807028.4 | 11.06.2015 | [2017/16] | WO2015US35399 | Priority number, date | US201462011019P | 11.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462011019 P | [2017/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015191899 | Date: | 17.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3155098 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C12N15/12, C12N9/10, C12N9/16, C07K14/755, A61K48/00, A61P7/00 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
C07K14/755 (EP);
A61K48/005 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
C12N15/102 (EP);
C12N15/907 (EP);
C12N9/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/16] | Title | German: | FAKTOR-VIII-MUTATIONSREPARATUR UND TOLERANZINDUKTION SOWIE ENTSPRECHENDE CDNA, ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME | [2017/16] | English: | FACTOR VIII MUTATION REPAIR AND TOLERANCE INDUCTION AND RELATED CDNAs, COMPOSITIONS, METHODS AND SYSTEMS | [2017/16] | French: | RÉPARATION DE MUTATIONS ET INDUCTION DE TOLÉRANCE DU FACTEUR VIII ET ADNC, COMPOSITIONS, PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES ASSOCIÉS | [2017/16] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 10.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/16] | 10.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/03] | 27.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0017375 (VLAAMS INTERUNIV INST BIOTECH [BE], et al) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * | [I] - C.-Y. PARK ET AL, "Targeted inversion and reversion of the blood coagulation factor 8 gene in human iPS cells using TALENs", PROCEEDINGS NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES PNAS, US, (20140609), vol. 111, no. 25, doi:10.1073/pnas.1323941111, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 9253 - 9258, XP055277137 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1323941111 | [Y] - LIN YI ET AL, "Use of blood outgrowth endothelial cells for gene therapy for hemophilia A", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (20020115), vol. 99, no. 2, doi:10.1182/BLOOD.V99.2.457, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 457 - 462, XP002430423 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood.V99.2.457 | [Y] - MATSUI HIDETO ET AL, "Ex vivo gene therapy for hemophilia a that enhances safe delivery and sustained in vivo factor VIII expression from lentivirally engineered endothelial progenitors", STEM CELLS (MIAMISBURG), (2007), vol. 25, no. 10, ISSN 1066-5099, pages 2660 - 2669, XP055426660 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1634/stemcells.2006-0699 | [Y] - WALSH C E, "GENE THERAPY PROGRESS AND PROSPECTS: GENE THERAPY FOR THE HEMOPHILIAS", GENE THERAPY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20030601), vol. 10, no. 12, doi:10.1038/SJ.GT.3302024, ISSN 0969-7128, pages 999 - 1003, XP001155785 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3302024 | International search | [Y]WO2012051343 (PHILADELPHIA CHILDREN HOSPITAL [US], et al) [Y] 19-21, 24-28 * See abstract; paragraphs [0062]-[0063], [0066], [0100] and [0157]; claims 1 and 4; figure 1a. *; | [A]US2012149115 (KIM JIN SOO [KR], et al) [A] 19-28 * See abstract; claims 1-2, 10 and 17. *; | [PX]WO2014089541 (HAPLOMICS INC [US], et al) [PX] 19-28 * See claims 1-2, 19-24, 30 and 33-34; figures 9-12. * | [YA] - LEE, HYUNG JOO et al., "Targeted chromosomal duplications and inversions in the human genome using zinc finger nucleases", Genome Research, (20120300), vol. 22, no. 3, pages 539 - 548, XP 055243750 [Y] 19-21, 24-28 * See abstract; page 539, right column, paragraph 3; page 544, left column, paragraph 3 - right column, paragraph 2; figure 4. * [A] 22-23 | [XY] - POWELL, JERRY S. et al., "Phase 1 trial of FVIII gene transfer for severe hemophilia A using a retroviral construct administered by peripheral intravenous infusion", Blood, (20030915), vol. 102, no. 6, pages 2038 - 2045, XP 055243753 [X] 22-23 * . See abstract; page 2038, right column, paragraph 3. * [Y] 19-21, 24-28 | [A] - TUDDENHAM, E.G.D. et al., "Haemophilia A: database of nucleotide substitutions, deletions, insertions and rearrangements of the factor VIII gene , second edition", Nucleic Acids Research, (19941111), vol. 22, no. 22, pages 4851 - 4868, XP001526143 [A] 19-28 * . See the whole document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/22.17.3511 |