Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017128244 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014121080 | 12.06.2014 | WO2015JP66805 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6711748B | Global Dossier | 17.06.2020 | B2 | JPWO2015190541 | 20.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014121080 | 12.06.2014 | WO2015JP66805 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106456345B | Global Dossier | 23.11.2021 | B | CN106456345 | 22.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014121080 | 12.06.2014 | WO2015JP66805 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3156011 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2018 | A4 | EP3156011 | 19.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014121080 | 12.06.2014 | WO2015JP66805 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015190541 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014121080 | 12.06.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2020124642 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014121080 | 12.06.2014 |