EP3230741 - ANTI-CARBAPENEMASE ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alere Technologies GmbH Löbstedter Straße 103 - 105 07749 Jena / DE | [2019/26] |
Former [2017/42] | For all designated states Alere Technologies GmbH Loebstedterstrasse 103 - 105 07749 Jena / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EHRICHT, Ralf Beutnitzer Strasse 6 07749 Jena / DE | 02 /
BUECHLER, Joseph 1343 Cassins Street Carlsbad, California 92011 / US | 03 /
MÜLLER, Elke Dornburger Strasse 126 07743 Jena / DE | 04 /
BRAUN, Sascha Schützenhofstrasse 32 07743 Jena / DE | 05 /
MONECKE, Stefan Erich-Weinert-Strasse 3 07749 Jena / DE | 06 /
REISSIG, Annett Eisenberger Strasse 6 07749 Jena / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/42] | 01 /
EHRICHT, Ralf Beutnitzer Strasse 6 07749 Jena / DE | ||
02 /
BUECHLER, Joseph 1343 Cassins Street Carlsbad, California 92011 / US | |||
03 /
MÜLLER, Elke Dornburger Strasse 126 07743 Jena / DE | |||
04 /
BRAUN, Sascha Schützenhofstrasse 32 07743 Jena / DE | |||
05 /
MONECKE, Stefan Erich-Weinert-Strasse 5 07749 Jena / DE | |||
06 /
REISSIG, Annett Eisenberger Strasse 6 07749 Jena / DE | Representative(s) | Huenges, Martin Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/42] | Huenges, Martin Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15808247.9 | 11.12.2015 | [2017/42] | WO2015EP79487 | Priority number, date | US201462090561P | 11.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462090561 P | GB20150003387 | 27.02.2015 Original published format: GB 201503387 | [2017/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016092096 | Date: | 16.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3230741 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/573, C07K16/12 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
G01N33/573 (EP);
C07K16/1203 (EP);
G01N2333/986 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Title | German: | ANTI-CARBAPENEMASE-ANTIKÖRPER UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2017/42] | English: | ANTI-CARBAPENEMASE ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF | [2017/42] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-CARBAPÉNÉMASES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2017/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 11.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 26.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/46] | Request for further processing for: | 30.05.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 30.05.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.06.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2011042454 (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR], et al) [A] 1-28 * the whole document, in particular page 19, line 14 to page 20, line 12; claims 1-3 *; | [XI]WO2013011072 (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR], et al) [X] 1,8-10,12-14,17,19-25,27,28 * the whole document, in particular page 3, lines 12-17; page 4, lines 6-22; page 9, lines 19-29; page 16, lines 3-6; page 18, line 32 to page 20, line 26; page 21, lines 7-10; page 23, lines 6-22; page 25, lines 22-29; page 26, lines 17-33; claims 8, 9 * [I] 2-7,11,15,16,18,26; | [X]WO2013112696 (LOS ANGELES BIOMED RES INST [US]) [X] 21,22 * the whole document, in particular paragraphs [0049], [0050]; claims 18, 68, 69 *; | [XI]WO2014160192 (MESO SCALE TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [X] 1,8-10,12-14,17-28 * the whole document, in particular page 54, lines 4-12; page 70, lines 26-31; page 74, lines 13-24; page 76, lines 23-31; page 78, lines 19-24; page 82, lines 17-25; page 91, lines 4-7; claims 1-8, 46-52, 61, 63-65, 67, 68 * [I] 2-7,11,15,16; | [A]WO2012143535 (BIO MERIEUX INC [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2010130882 (LICENTIA LTD [FI], et al) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [A] - TOMOE KITAO ET AL, "Development of an immunochromatographic assay for diagnosing the production of IMP-type metallo-beta-lactamases that mediate carbapenem resistance in", JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 87, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.MIMET.2011.09.011, ISSN 0167-7012, (20110923), pages 330 - 337, (20111001), XP028109164 [A] 1-28 * the whole document, in particular abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mimet.2011.09.011 | [XI] - Anonymous, "New delhi metallo-beta-lactamase-1 (NDM-1) ELISA kit", internet article, (20121012), pages 1 - 14, URL: http://www.hoelzel-biotech.com/media/import/pdf_manual/Cusabio//CSB-E14924__Manual.pdf, (20160215), XP055250159 [X] 1,9,10,12-14,17,19,21,23,25,27,28 * the whole document, in particular page 1, lines 1-6; page 2, first and last paragraphs * [I] 2-8,11,15,16,18,20,22,24,26 | [A] - HAMMOUDI D ET AL, "How to detect carbapenemase producers? A literature review of phenotypic and molecular methods", JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGICAL METHODS, (20141007), vol. 107, doi:10.1016/J.MIMET.2014.09.009, ISSN 0167-7012, pages 106 - 118, XP029098803 [A] 1-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mimet.2014.09.009 | [XI] - ANDREA ENDIMIANI ET AL, "Emergence of blaKPC-containing Klebsiella pneumoniae in a long-term acute care hospital: a new challenge to our healthcare system", JOURNAL OF ANTIMICROBIAL CHEMOTHERAPY, (20090909), vol. 64, pages 1102 - 1110, XP055250179 [X] 1,9-12,19,21,23,25,27,28 * the whole document in particular abstract; page 1104, section "immunoblotting"; page 1106, section "expression levels of KPC enzymes ..."; figure 1 * [I] 2-8,13-18,20,22,24,26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jac/dkp327 | [XI] - L. BORGIANNI ET AL, "Mutational Analysis of VIM-2 Reveals an Essential Determinant for Metallo- -Lactamase Stability and Folding", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, US, (20100524), vol. 54, no. 8, doi:10.1128/AAC.01336-09, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 3197 - 3204, XP055269017 [X] 1,11,12,19,21,23,25,27,28 * the whole document, in particular page 3198, column 1, lines 29-32; page 3203, column 1, lines 13-20 * [I] 2-10,13-18,20,22,24,26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AAC.01336-09 | [A] - L. POIREL ET AL, "OXA-48-like carbapenemases: the phantom menace", JOURNAL OF ANTIMICROBIAL CHEMOTHERAPY, (20120411), vol. 67, no. 7, doi:10.1093/jac/dks121, ISSN 0305-7453, pages 1597 - 1606, XP055059209 [A] 1-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jac/dks121 |