EP3224492 - HEAD-UP DISPLAY FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Comfort and Driving Assistance 76, rue Auguste Perret ZI Europarc 94046 Créteil Cedex / FR | [2017/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERAUD, Henry c/o Valeo Comfort and Driving Assistance 76 rue Auguste Perret - ZI Europarc 94046 Créteil CEDEX / FR | 02 /
CORDUAN, Patrick c/o Valeo Comfort and Driving Assistance 76 rue Auguste Perret - ZI Europarc 94046 Créteil CEDEX / FR | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | Delplanque, Arnaud Valeo Comfort and Driving Assistance 6 rue Daniel Costantini 94000 Créteil / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/40] | Delplanque, Arnaud VALEO Comfort and Driving Assistance 76, rue Auguste Perret Z.I. Europarc 94046 Créteil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 15808763.5 | 27.11.2015 | [2017/40] | WO2015FR53252 | Priority number, date | FR20140061681 | 28.11.2014 Original published format: FR 1461681 | [2017/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016083762 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3224492 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3224492 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16C7/00, G02B27/01, G02B7/182 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
G02B27/0149 (EP,CN,US);
B60K35/00 (US);
B60K35/213 (EP,US);
F16H21/44 (US);
G02B26/0816 (US);
G02B7/1821 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEADUP-ANZEIGE FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2017/40] | English: | HEAD-UP DISPLAY FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2017/40] | French: | AFFICHEUR TETE HAUTE POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/40] | Afficheur tête haute pour véhicule automobile | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 28.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.11.2015 | AL | 09.01.2019 | AT | 09.01.2019 | CY | 09.01.2019 | CZ | 09.01.2019 | DK | 09.01.2019 | EE | 09.01.2019 | ES | 09.01.2019 | FI | 09.01.2019 | HR | 09.01.2019 | IT | 09.01.2019 | LT | 09.01.2019 | LV | 09.01.2019 | MC | 09.01.2019 | MK | 09.01.2019 | MT | 09.01.2019 | NL | 09.01.2019 | PL | 09.01.2019 | RO | 09.01.2019 | RS | 09.01.2019 | SE | 09.01.2019 | SI | 09.01.2019 | SK | 09.01.2019 | SM | 09.01.2019 | TR | 09.01.2019 | BG | 09.04.2019 | NO | 09.04.2019 | GR | 10.04.2019 | IS | 09.05.2019 | PT | 09.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 27.11.2015 | |
AL | 09.01.2019 | ||
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
MT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 27.11.2015 | |
AL | 09.01.2019 | ||
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 09.01.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1079986 (MEFINA SA) [A] 7-11 * figure 5 *; | [A]JP2000137189 (KANSEI KK) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1550572 (NIPPON SEIKI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [XI]JP2009184406 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-6,13 * paragraph [0061]; figure 32 * [I] 12; | [I]EP2322972 (JOHNSON CONTROLS TECH CO [US]) [I] 1-6,12,13 * paragraphs [0002] , [0024] , [0029]; figure 5 * |