Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017123593 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14172520 | 16.06.2014 | WO2015IB54536 | 16.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20170018837 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP14172520 | 16.06.2014 | WO2015IB54536 | 16.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017521770 | Global Dossier | 03.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP14172520 | 16.06.2014 | WO2015IB54536 | 16.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106461388 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP14172520 | 16.06.2014 | WO2015IB54536 | 16.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3155367 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2018 | A4 | EP3155367 | 19.04.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP14172520 | 16.06.2014 | WO2015IB54536 | 16.06.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015193804 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2016 | A3 | WO2015193804 | 23.12.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP14172520 | 16.06.2014 |