EP3155367 - DETECTOR FOR DETERMINING A POSITION OF AT LEAST ONE OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2017/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEND, Robert Luisenstrasse 25 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
BRUDER, Ingmar Am Dreschplatz 12 67271 Neuleiningen / DE | 03 /
IRLE, Stephan Theodorstrasse 13 57074 Siegen / DE | 04 /
THIEL, Erwin Schöntalstrasse 4 57076 Siegen / DE | [2017/16] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 2 68165 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/16] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Dudenstrasse 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 15808953.2 | 16.06.2015 | [2017/16] | WO2015IB54536 | Priority number, date | EP20140172520 | 16.06.2014 Original published format: EP 14172520 | [2017/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015193804 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3155367 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/042, G01C3/06, G01D5/34, G01N21/47, G06F3/041 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
G06F3/041661 (EP,KR,US);
G01D5/342 (KR,US);
G01N21/4795 (KR,US);
G06F3/0416 (KR);
G06F3/042 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0421 (KR,US);
G06F3/0486 (KR);
G06F3/04883 (KR);
G06F2203/04101 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/16] | G01C3/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/16] | Title | German: | DETEKTOR ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER POSITION MINDESTENS EINES OBJEKTS | [2017/16] | English: | DETECTOR FOR DETERMINING A POSITION OF AT LEAST ONE OBJECT | [2017/16] | French: | DÉTECTEUR PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER LA POSITION D'AU MOINS UN OBJET | [2017/16] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/16] | 03.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/24] | 29.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2676102 (BASF SE [DE]) [I] 1-20 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0140] - paragraph [0148] * * paragraph [0159] - paragraph [0164] * * paragraph [0166] - paragraph [0190] *; | [A]US2012062517 (LAI HUNG-CHING [TW], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023] *; | [A]EP0185450 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US4346293 (FETZER GUENTER) [A] 1-20 * column 3, line 18 - column 5, line 15 *; | [A]US2007046625 (YEE DAWSON [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034] * | International search | [A]WO2012110924 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [A] 1-26 * description pages 2 to 30, figure 1 *; | [A]US2008259310 (WADA HIDEO [JP]) [A] 1-26 * see the whole document *; | [A]US2011194097 (YAMAGUCHI AKIFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-26 * see the whole document *; | [A]CN101290348 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-26 * see the whole document *; | [A]CN102549381 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1-26 * see the whole document *; | [A]JP2005241340 (SHARP KK) [A] 1-26 * see the whole document * |