EP3158505 - A METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR OBJECT RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trax Technology Solutions Pte Ltd. 28 Bukit Pasoh Road Singapore 089842 / SG | [2017/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COHEN, Daniel Shimon 5/5 Elimelech Rimlat Street 4373015 Ra'anana / IL | 02 /
ADATO, Yair Moshav Tomer 9068000 Tomer / IL | 03 /
POMERANZ, Dolev 14 Szold Street 4440308 Kfar Saba / IL | [2017/17] | Representative(s) | Finnegan Europe LLP 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BG / GB | [2023/23] |
Former [2017/17] | Finnegan Europe LLP 16 Old Bailey London EC4M 7EG / GB | Application number, filing date | 15809764.2 | 07.06.2015 | [2017/17] | WO2015IL50576 | Priority number, date | IL20140233208 | 18.06.2014 Original published format: IL 23320814 | [2017/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015193877 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3158505 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3158505 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 23.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06V10/94, G06V30/24, G06Q10/08 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
G06F18/22 (US);
G06V10/95 (EP,US);
G06V30/2504 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/08] | G06Q10/08, G06K9/00, G06K9/62, G06K9/68 | ||
Former IPC [2017/17] | G06K9/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR OBJEKTERKENNUNG | [2017/17] | English: | A METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR OBJECT RECOGNITION | [2017/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE RECONNAISSANCE D'OBJET | [2017/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/17] | 16.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2021/51] |
Former [2021/12] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | ||
Date: | 10.02.2021 | ||
[2021/51] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | IE | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | GB | 07.09.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/24] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
IE | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
IE | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006240862 (NEVEN HARTMUT [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0007]; paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0056] *; | [A]US2009185784 (HIROIKE ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2010217678 (GONCALVES LUIS F [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1, 3 *; | [A]US2011115917 (LEE HOU-HSIEN [TW], et al) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0017] *; | [IA]US2011128150 (KANGA RUSTOM ADI [AU], et al) [I] 1-7,9,10 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0098]; figures 1,2 * [A] 8 | International search | [A]US2011173100 (BONCYK WAYNE C [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012051652 (LEE JI HYO [KR], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012243739 (FUKUCHI MASAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [A]US2014009382 (CHOU CHIA-TE [TW], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0045], [0049], [0055], [0057] * | by applicant | IL229806D |