EP3155566 - SYSTEM, APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SUPPORTING FORMAL VERIFICATION OF INFORMAL INFERENCE ON A COMPUTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baum, Eric Burton 87 Lovers Lane Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [2018/36] |
Former [2017/16] | For all designated states Baum, Eric Burton 1484 Grizzly Peak Blvd. Berkeley, CA 94708 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/16] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [2017/16] | Application number, filing date | 15810342.4 | 12.06.2015 | [2017/16] | WO2015US35641 | Priority number, date | US201462012682P | 16.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462012682 P | US201462034574P | 07.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462034574 P | US201462081823P | 19.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462081823 P | [2017/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015195485 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3155566 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06N7/00, G06N5/02, G06Q10/10 | [2018/18] | CPC: |
G06N5/022 (EP,IL,US);
G06N5/048 (IL,US);
G06N5/013 (EP);
G06N7/01 (EP,IL,US);
G06Q10/101 (EP,IL,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/16] | G06Q10/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/16] | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DER FORMALEN VERIFIZIERUNG VON INOFFIZIELLER INFERENZ AUF EINEM COMPUTER | [2017/16] | English: | SYSTEM, APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SUPPORTING FORMAL VERIFICATION OF INFORMAL INFERENCE ON A COMPUTER | [2017/16] | French: | SYSTÈME, APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRISE EN CHARGE D'UNE VÉRIFICATION FORMELLE D'INFÉRENCE INFORMELLE SUR UN ORDINATEUR | [2017/16] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/16] | 13.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/17] | 04.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.11.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 09.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.12.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005203924 (ROSENBERG GERALD B [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0032] ** paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0098] *; | [XI]US2007005520 (EICK STEPHEN G [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9,11-14,16,18,19 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0122] - paragraph [0127] * * paragraph [0137] - paragraph [0158] * [I] 7-9,15,17; | [A]US2008222279 (CIOFFI LUCAS [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0042] *; | [A]US2009228478 (STEICHEN TERRIL JOHN [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0155] *; | [A]US2010217717 (OVERBY WALTER [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0098] *; | [A]US2014108321 (BUCHANAN DAVID W [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [00013] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0159] - paragraph [0172] * | International search | [Y]US6105018 (DEMERS ALAN [US], et al) [Y] 9-17 * , entire document *; | [Y]EP1081593 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [Y] 8 * , entire document *; | [A]US2005108036 (ANDREOLI JEAN-MARC [FR], et al) [A] 1-19 * , entire document *; | [Y]US2005203924 (ROSENBERG GERALD B [US]) [Y] 1-19 * , entire document *; | [Y]US2009228478 (STEICHEN TERRIL JOHN [US]) [Y] 1-19 * , entire document *; | [A]US7739671 (HINCHEY MICHAEL G [US], et al) [A] 1-19* , entire document *; | [Y]US2010217717 (OVERBY WALTER [US]) [Y] 1-19 * , entire document *; | [Y]US2011140360 (GOLIE TIM [US]) [Y] 17 * , entire document * |